California Central District Court
Judge:Sherilyn Peace Garnett
Referred: Alicia G Rosenberg
Case #: 2:25-cv-03115
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 25STCV05828
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 5:05 PM PDT
Defendant
Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Represented By
Sabrina Celia Narain
Ltl Attorneys LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Emmanuel Aguilar


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
11 11 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 05/06 1:48 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report submitted by the parties and determines that an in-person Scheduling Conference is unnecessary. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the May 14, 2025, Scheduling Conference. Trial Order to be issued. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
10 10 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Wed 04/30 5:38 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Scheduling Report ; estimated length of trial 3-5 days, filed by Plaintiff Emmanuel Aguilar..(Serrano, Luis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES WORKSHEET
Monday, April 14, 2025
9 9 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Mon 04/14 12:19 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, served on 4/11/25.(Narain, Sabrina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - MBUSA Notice to State Court re Removal,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - MBUSA Email to Adverse Party
Friday, April 11, 2025
8 8 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 04/11 2:36 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/30/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2025 at 03:00 PM before Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 04/11 2:31 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 04/10 7:38 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 04/10 7:37 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 04/10 7:36 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 04/09 4:46 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, (Narain, Sabrina)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 04/09 4:44 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Narain, Sabrina)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 04/09 4:43 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 25STCV05828 Receipt No: ACACDC-39477152 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attorney Sabrina Celia Narain added to party Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC(pty:dft))(Narain, Sabrina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Sabrina Narain in support of Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Exhibit A
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Thu 04/10 7:00 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Case assigned to Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Emmanuel Aguilar. Filed in State Court on 3/3/2025 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Thu 04/10 7:07 PM
NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Submitted with Attachment 2 pg 9 to Exhibit A Notice of Removal1 (Attorney Jacky P. Wang added to party Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC(pty:dft))(car)
Related: [-]