California Central District Court
Judge:R Gary Klausner
Referred: Stephanie S Christensen
Case #: 2:25-cv-03123
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Case in other court:Los Angeles County Superior Court, 25CMCV00351
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 6:02 PM PDT
Defendant
DOES
Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant
West American Insurance Company
Plaintiff
Great Eastern Entertainment Company


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
16 16 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Mon 05/12 2:15 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-4 days, filed by Defendants Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, West American Insurance Company.. (Sveslosky, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
15 15 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Fri 05/09 9:57 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ONLY WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)14 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is dismissed from this action, with prejudice. (lom)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
14 14 stip Dismiss Party Thu 05/08 1:36 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company filed by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Sveslosky, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)
13 13 order Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106) - optional html form Thu 05/08 10:17 AM
ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner re Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))12 . The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): Other error(s) with document(s): Improper request for dismissal. Answer has been filed. (jre)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
12 12 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) Wed 05/07 3:04 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Great Eastern Entertainment Company pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Kanne, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
11 11 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Wed 04/16 11:02 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, West American Insurance Company, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form4 served on April 15, 2025. (Sveslosky, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
10 10 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Tue 04/15 2:45 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, West American Insurance Company, Re Standing Order Regarding Newly Assigned Case served on April 15, 2025. (Sveslosky, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
9 9 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Mon 04/14 3:02 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, West American Insurance Company, re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form6 served on April 14, 2025. (Sveslosky, Scott)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Mon 04/14 1:56 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/12/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 5/19/2025 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 04/14 1:54 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 04/11 2:40 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 04/11 2:40 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 04/11 2:39 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 04/09 6:41 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, West American Insurance Company, identifying A. Party: West American Insurance Company. 1. Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. owns 100% of the stock of LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc. 2. LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc. owns 100% of the stock of Liberty Mutual Group Inc. 3. Liberty Mutual Group Inc. owns 100% of the stock of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company and Employers Insurance Company of Wausau. 4 Liberty Mutual Insurance Company owns 78%, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company owns 6%, Peerless Insurance Company owns 8% and Employers Insurance Company of Wausau owns 8% of the stock of Ohio Casualty Corporation. 5. Ohio Casualty Corporation owns 100% of the stock of The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. 6. The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company owns 100% of the stock of West American Insurance Company; B. Party: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. 1. Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. owns 100% of the stock of LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc. 2. LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc. owns 100% of the stock of Liberty Mutual Group Inc. Liberty Mutual Group Inc. owns 100% of the stock of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.. (Sveslosky, Scott)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 04/09 6:22 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, West American Insurance Company. (Sveslosky, Scott)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 04/09 6:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 25CMCV00351 Receipt No: ACACDC-39477670 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendants West American Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attorney Scott R Sveslosky added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Scott R Sveslosky added to party West American Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Sveslosky, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 17 pgs Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proofs of Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Defendants Liberty Mutual Insurance Company's and West American Insurance Company's Answer to Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Other Pleadings
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 04/11 2:53 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-50, inclusive, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, West American Insurance Company. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Great Eastern Entertainment Company. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/4/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 04/11 2:56 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Great Eastern Entertainment Company, upon Defendant West American Insurance Company served on 3/12/2025, answer due 4/2/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service-Rebecca Vang-Person Authorized to Accept Services of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/17/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED B) (ghap)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 04/11 2:59 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Great Eastern Entertainment Company, upon Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company served on 3/12/2025, answer due 4/2/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service-Rebecca Vang-Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/17/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B) (ghap)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Fri 04/11 3:02 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, West American Insurance Company. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/8/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C) (ghap)
Related: [-]