Hawaii District Court
Judge:Shanlyn AS Park
Referred: Wes Reber Porter
Case #: 1:25-cv-00151
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance - Commissioner Thu 05/01 10:15 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Angela Thornton-Millard appearing for Commissioner of Social Security (Paperless filing) on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Thornton-Millard, Angela)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/23 2:15 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO KATE M. ALBERT, ESQ. re5 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 4/23/2025. (eta)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/23 11:30 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-3144865.Diane C. Haar appearing for Plaintiff Donna Darlene Berry(Haar, Diane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 11, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/11 10:02 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dana A. Barbata on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Barbata, Dana)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Social Security Case Service Fri 04/11 9:32 AM
NOTICE of Social Security Case Service: Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405 (g), the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Case Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing System (CM/ECF) notifying the appropriate Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorneys Office of the filing of this case. (eta)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Fri 04/11 9:29 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 25-00151 SASP-WRP on all further pleadings . (eta)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/11 9:19 AM
COMPLAINT for Review of Social Security Disability Insurance Determination against Leland Dudek, Acting Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $ 405, AHIDC-3139213 ), filed by Donna Darlene Berry.(Haar, Diane) Modified on 4/11/2025 (eta)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet