Florida Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Karen K Specie
Case #: 5:25-bk-50067
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 19, 2025

Debtor
Gus's No Fuss Pool Service, LLC
2464 Lawrence Rd
Marianna, FL 32446-2562
Represented By
India Footman
Footman Law Firm, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Mary W. Colon
P.O. Box 14596
Tallahassee, FL 32317
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
110 E. Park Avenue Suite 128
Tallahassee, FL 32301


Docket last updated: 04/10/2025 12:04 AM EDT
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
1 1 caseupld Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 (Case Upload) Wed 04/09 4:39 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual (Filing Fee: $338.00) Filed by India Footman on behalf of Gus's No Fuss Pool Service, LLC. (Footman, India)
Related: [-]
2 2 court AJTA - Ch 7 Business Wed 04/09 11:47 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors and Appointment of Trustee Mary Colon with 341(a) Meeting of Creditors to be held on 5/19/2025 at 10:00 AM at Zoom - Colon: Meeting ID 668 908 9509, Passcode 4564070145, Phone 1 850 971 6270. (ajta)
Related: [-]