New York Southern District Court
Judge:Edgardo Ramos
Case #: 1:25-cv-02949
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 10, 2025 1:07 AM EDT
Defendant
Taha Ahmed Abozayd
Defendant
Buggie Down Shop Corporation
Plaintiff
Edward Conde
Represented By
Clara Lam
Brown Kwon & Lam, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
11 11 service Summons Issued Tue 04/15 4:10 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Taha Ahmed Abozayd..(jgo)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued Tue 04/15 4:09 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Buggie Down Shop Corporation..(jgo)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
9 9 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 04/14 4:26 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Taha Ahmed Abozayd, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Edward Conde(on behalf of himself), Edward Conde(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Lam, Clara)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 04/14 4:15 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Buggie Down Shop Corporation, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Edward Conde(on behalf of himself), Edward Conde(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Lam, Clara)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 04/14 3:41 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Clara Lam to RE-FILE Document No. 7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the filers were not selected for the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Add Party for Pleading Mon 04/14 4:13 PM
ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Edward Conde added. Party added pursuant to1 Complaint.Document filed by Edward Conde. Related document:1 Complaint..(Lam, Clara)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 04/11 4:51 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Buggie Down Shop Corporation, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Edward Conde..(Lam, Clara)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 04/11 4:11 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Clara Lam to RE-FILE Document No. 6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the filers were not selected for the request for issuance of summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 04/10 3:18 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Buggie Down Shop Corporation, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Edward Conde..(Lam, Clara)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 04/10 2:43 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Taha Ahmed Abozayd..(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 04/10 1:19 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 04/10 1:19 PM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 04/10 1:19 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 04/10 1:20 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Clara Lam to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; list the defendant's name on the docket entry;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Thu 04/10 1:23 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Clara Lam. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Edward Conde. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Thu 04/10 1:24 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Clara Lam re: Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Add Edward Conde to CM ECF with the party text "on behalf of others similarly situated". Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 04/09 10:34 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Taha Ahmed Abozayd, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Edward Conde..(Lam, Clara)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 04/09 10:32 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Edward Conde..(Lam, Clara)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 04/09 9:48 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lam, Clara)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/09 9:48 PM
COMPLAINT against Taha Ahmed Abozayd, Buggie Down Shop Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30908036)Document filed by Edward Conde..(Lam, Clara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent to Sue