New York Southern District Court
Judge:Kenneth M Karas
Case #: 7:25-cv-02947
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 10, 2025 1:08 AM EDT
All Plaintiffs
JACOB GROSS on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
464 Malbone Street, Suite 100
Brooklyn, NY 11225
Represented By
Levi Huebner
Levi Huebner & Associates, PC
contact info
Defendant
JOAN COLLINS in her official and individual capacity
Defendant
JOHN CALVELLO in his official and individual capacity
Defendant
Michael Spinelli
Defendant
Village of Woodridge, New York
Defendant
WOODRIDGE POLICE STATION


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 22, 2025
15 15 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 05/22 10:36 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:14 Letter extension request, filed by Joan Collins, Village of Woodridge, Michael Spinelli, John Calvello, Woodridge Police Station. ENDORSEMENT : Granted. So Ordered., (Joan Collins answer due 6/25/2025; John Calvello answer due 6/25/2025; Michael Spinelli answer due 6/25/2025; Village of Woodridge answer due 6/25/2025; Woodridge Police Station answer due 6/25/2025.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/21/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
14 14 misc Letter Wed 05/21 3:47 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Adam L. Rodd, Esq. dated May 21, 2025 re: requesting an extension of time. Document filed by Joan Collins, John Calvello, Michael Spinelli, Village of Woodridge, Woodridge Police Station..(Rodd, Adam)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Certificate of Service Other Wed 05/21 2:44 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance served on Levi Huebner & Associates PC on May 21, 2025. Document filed by Joan Collins, John Calvello, Michael Spinelli, Village of Woodridge, Woodridge Police Station..(Rodd, Adam)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/21 2:42 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Rodd on behalf of Joan Collins, John Calvello, Michael Spinelli, Village of Woodridge, Woodridge Police Station..(Rodd, Adam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
11 11 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 05/20 6:14 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Huebner, Levi)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 05/20 6:06 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Village of Woodridge served on 5/16/2025, answer due 6/6/2025. Service was accepted by John Cavello - CPLR 3113 . Document filed by Jacob Gross..(Huebner, Levi)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 05/20 6:05 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Michael Spinelli served on 5/20/2025, answer due 6/10/2025. Service was accepted by John Cavello - CPLR 3082 . Document filed by Jacob Gross..(Huebner, Levi)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 05/20 6:03 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Woodridge Police Station served on 5/16/2025, answer due 6/6/2025. Service was accepted by John Cavello - CPLR 3113 . Document filed by Jacob Gross..(Huebner, Levi)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 05/20 6:00 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Joan Collins served on 5/20/2025, answer due 6/10/2025. Service was accepted by John Cavello - CPLR 3082 . Document filed by Jacob Gross..(Huebner, Levi)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 05/20 5:57 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. John Calvello served on 5/16/2025, answer due 6/6/2025. Service was accepted by John Cavello. Document filed by Jacob Gross..(Huebner, Levi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 04/10 2:42 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joan Collins, John Calvello, Michael Spinelli, Village of Woodridge, Woodridge Police Station..(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 04/10 1:40 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 04/10 1:40 PM
Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 04/10 1:40 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Thu 04/10 1:41 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Levi Huebner. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to Sullivan; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Thu 04/10 1:41 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Levi Huebner. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: JOAN COLLINS in her official and individual capacity, JOHN CALVELLO in his official and individual capacity, Village of Woodridge, New York, WOODRIDGE POLICE STATION, JACOB GROSS on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/10 1:41 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Levi Huebner to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet, 4 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; civil cover sheet was not signed. Do not fill out citizenship of principal parties if Jurisdiction is not Diversity;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 04/09 8:28 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Huebner, Levi)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 04/09 8:26 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to VILLAGE OF WOODRIDGE, WOODRIDGE POLICE STATION, JOAN COLLINS in her official and individual capacity, JOHN CALVELLO in his official and individual capacity, MICHAEL SPINELLI, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by JACOB GROSS on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated..(Huebner, Levi)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 04/09 8:19 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Huebner, Levi)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/09 8:12 PM
COMPLAINT against JOAN COLLINS in her official and individual capacity, JOHN CALVELLO in his official and individual capacity, Michael Spinelli, Village of Woodridge, New York, WOODRIDGE POLICE STATION. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30907900)Document filed by JACOB GROSS on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated..(Huebner, Levi)
Related: [-]