Kai-Lynn Bradford v. 3M Company et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-01847 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2025 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 5:52 AM EDT |
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliances Co Inc
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
|
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
individually and as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
WL Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
3M Center
St. Paul, MN 55133 |
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairway Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
EI DuPont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Kai-Lynn Bradford
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 09, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 04/09 1:11 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 3/14/2025), Kai-Lynn Bradford v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:25-cv-01847-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Eastern District of Michigan (jbin) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbin) |
|
Friday, March 14, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12325299.), filed by Kai-Lynn Bradford. Service due by 6/12/2025 (jbin) |