California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando M Olguin
Referred: Stephanie S Christensen
Case #: 2:25-cv-03129
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Terminated:May 01, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 10, 2025 12:37 AM PDT
Defendant
DOES 1-100, inclusive,
Defendant
FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Represented By
Aubrey L. Kramer
Shook, Hardy And Bacon LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sharron Craig


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
11 11 order Dismissing Case Thu 05/01 12:54 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Case Terminated; Made JS-6) (vdr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
10 10 notice Settlement Tue 04/29 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Settlement (JOINT NOTICE) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Kramer, Aubrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
9 9 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Mon 04/14 10:35 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 5/15/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
Related: [-]
8 8 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 04/14 10:34 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 04/11 12:46 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (mza)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 04/11 12:46 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (mza)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 04/11 12:45 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen. (mza)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
4 4 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Wed 04/09 8:02 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 served on April 9, 2025. (Kramer, Aubrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 04/09 7:58 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY, identifying Ford Motor Company. (Kramer, Aubrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 04/09 7:54 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Kramer, Aubrey)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 04/09 7:51 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los, case number 25STCV06591 Receipt No: ACACDC-39477905 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Attorney Aubrey L. Kramer added to party FORD MOTOR COMPANY(pty:dft))(Kramer, Aubrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh. A to Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh. B to Notice of Removal
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 04/11 12:38 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Ford Motor Company. Jury Demanded. Filed by Plaintiff Sharron Craig. [FILED IN STATE COURT 3/7/25. SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (mza)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Fri 04/11 12:42 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. [FILED IN STATE COURT 4/9/25. SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 EXHIBIT B TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (mza)
Related: [-]