Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:25-mj-01832
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 10, 2025 12:47 AM MST
Defendant
Jesus Alexis Parra-Burgos (1)
Represented By
Natalie Hubbs Haywood
Law Office Of Natalie H Haywood PC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Desiree N Chery
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/10/2025 2:55 AM MST
Friday, April 04, 2025
Arrest of Jesus Alexis Parra-Burgos on 4/4/2025. (SGG)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jesus Alexis Parra-Burgos. (SGG)
Related: [-]