Maine District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-00125
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 10, 2025 3:20 AM EDT
Defendant
KEVIN BELL (1)
Represented By
GRAINNE DUNNE
Federal Defender'S Office
contact info
CALEIGH MILTON
Federal Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
NICHOLAS S. HEIMBACH
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/10/2025 4:30 AM EDT
Monday, April 07, 2025
Arrest of KEVIN BELL (nrg) Modified on 4/8/2025 to correct date (nrg).
Related: [-]
1 1 MOTION to Seal by USA as to KEVIN BELL (nrg)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORAL ORDER granting1 Motion to Seal as to KEVIN BELL (1) By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (nrg)
Related: [-]
3 3 COMPLAINT (Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF) as to KEVIN BELL (1). (nrg) Modified on 4/8/2025 to unseal (nrg).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Bradford Nunan
4 4 SYNOPSIS as to KEVIN BELL (nrg)
Related: [-]
5 5 Arrest Warrant Issued by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF as to KEVIN BELL. Warrant provided to U.S. Marshals Service. (nrg)
Related: [-]