Minnesota District Court
Case #: 0:25-mj-00206
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2025
Terminated:Apr 08, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 10, 2025 2:16 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Nathan Hoye Nelson
Doj-Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jody Lynn Sherry-Berg (1)
Terminated: 04/08/2025
Represented By
Katherian D Roe
Office Of The Federal Defender
contact info
Jean M Brandl
Office Of The Federal Defender - Mn
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/10/2025 3:22 AM CDT
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
Arrest (Rule 5) of Jody Lynn Sherry-Berg (MME)
Related: [-]
1 1 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jon T. Huseby: Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c) (3) Proceedings as to Jody Lynn Sherry-Berg held on 4/8/2025. Counsel appointed on a provisional basis. Arraignment set for 4/21/2025 at 02:00 PM in Grand Forks, ND Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Personal Recognizance Bond set with conditions, see Order Setting Conditions of Release. (Digital Recording) (MME)
Related: [-]
2 2 Brady Obligation Order as to Jody Lynn Sherry-Berg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon T. Huseby on 4/8/2025.(MME)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER OF REMOVAL to District of North Dakota as to Jody Lynn Sherry-Berg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon T. Huseby on 4/8/2025. (MME)
Related: [-]
4 4 Notice to North Dakota of a Rule 5 as to Jody Lynn Sherry-Berg. Your case number is: 3:25-cr-86. (If you need certified copies, please send a request to InterDistrictTransfer_MND@mnd.uscourts.gov.) (If you wish to designate a different email address for future transfers, send your request to InterDistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov.) (MME)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Jody Lynn Sherry-Berg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon T. Huseby on 4/8/2025. (MME)
Related: [-]
6 6 Personal Recognizance Bond Entered as to Jody Lynn Sherry-Berg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon T. Huseby on 4/8/2025. (MME)
Related: [-]
7 7 Notice to North Dakota of a Rule 5 as to Jody Lynn Sherry-Berg. Your case number is: 3:25-cr-86. (If you need certified copies, please send a request to InterDistrictTransfer_MND@mnd.uscourts.gov.) (If you wish to designate a different email address for future transfers, send your request to InterDistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov.) (MME)
Related: [-]