South Carolina District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00534
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 10, 2025 3:18 AM EDT
Defendant
Eduar Flores Reyes (1)
Represented By
Charles William Cochran
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Dean H Secor
Us Attorneys Office (chas)
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/10/2025 4:27 AM EDT
Monday, March 17, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT AND AFFIDAVIT as to Eduar Flores Reyes (1). (egra, ) [2:25-mj-00014-MCRI]
Related: [-]
2 2 Sealed Document (egra, ) [2:25-mj-00014-MCRI]
Related: [-]
4 4 Arrest of Eduar Flores Reyes in District of Georgia. Clerk notified by: AUSA. (egra, ) [2:25-mj-00014-MCRI]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
5 5 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Eduar Flores Reyes Initial Appearance set for 3/20/2025 01:30 PM in Charleston Courtroom #5, U. S. Court House, 85 Broad St, Charleston before Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry. (egra, ) [2:25-mj-00014-MCRI]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
6 6 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit Related [+] by Eduar Flores Reyes (egra, ) [2:25-mj-00014-MCRI]
Related: [-] stricted Access
7 7 TEXT ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Eduar Flores Reyes; Charles William Cochran for Eduar Flores Reyes Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 03/20/2025. (egra, ) [2:25-mj-00014-MCRI]
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry: Initial Appearance as to Eduar Flores Reyes held on 3/20/2025. AUSA Dean Secor present for the government. Interpreter Luna Gainer present and previous sworn. Court appoints FPD's office; AFPD Charlie Cochran present from that office. Court reviews FRCrP Rule 5 Disclosure and directs that a written copy be filed. Government moves for detention. Defendant waives preliminary hearing. Defendant waives detention hearing without prejudice. Defendant remains detained. Alyssa Gazic, CS. Court Interpreter:Luna Gainer. Language: Spanish. (egra, ) [2:25-mj-00014-MCRI]
Related: [-]
9 9 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Eduar Flores Reyes (egra, ) [2:25-mj-00014-MCRI]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Eduar Flores Reyes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 03/20/2025. (egra, ) [2:25-mj-00014-MCRI]
Related: [-]
11 11 FRCrP 5(f) DISCLOSURE ORDER as to Eduar Flores Reyes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 03/20/2025. (egra, ) [2:25-mj-00014-MCRI]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
13 13 INDICTMENT (Sealed Grand Jury Ballot attached) as to Eduar Flores Reyes (1) count(s) 1. (egra, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 GJ Ballot