Original Case: 1:19-cv-02170

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01598
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit315 Torts - Personal Injury - Airplane Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Terminated:Apr 15, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 7:48 AM CDT
Appellee
CLIFFORD LAW OFFICES
Represented By
Robert A. Clifford
CLIFFORD LAW OFFICES, P.C.
contact info
Appellee
COTCHETT, PITRE & MCCARTHY, LLP
Represented By
Robert A. Clifford
CLIFFORD LAW OFFICES, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
BOEING COMPANY
Represented By
Dan K. Webb
WINSTON & STRAWN LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOSHUA M. BABU, Individually and as Co-Personal Representatives of the Estate of JARED BABU MWAZO, deceased
Represented By
Eric C. Onyango
PRIME LEGAL, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
EMILY C. BABU, Individually and as Co-Personal Representatives of the Estate of JARED BABU MWAZO, deceased
Represented By
Eric C. Onyango
PRIME LEGAL, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/17/2025 7:46 AM CDT
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Emily C. Babu and Joshua M. Babu by 04/15/2025. Transcript information sheet due by 04/23/2025. Fee or IFP forms due on 04/23/2025 for Appellants Emily C. Babu and Joshua M. Babu. [1] [7445629] 25-1598 (CG) [Entered: 04/09/2025 11:29 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 350 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court
Att: 4 2 pgs Fee Notice
2 2 4 pgs Motion filed by Appellant Joshua M. Babu in 25-1418 Appellant Emily C. Babu in 25-1598 To consolidate case with Appeal No 25-1598 or treat amended notice of appeal as operative notice of appeal in this case and for other appropriate relief. [2] [7445706] 25-1418 25-1598 (Onyango, Eric) [Entered: 04/09/2025 01:57 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs ORDER: A preliminary review of the short record suggests that this amended notice of appeal duplicates an appeal filed on March 13, 2025, and docketed in this court as Appeal No. 25-1418 or is untimely. To the extent appellants amended the notice of appeal to clarify that they were appealing under 28 U.S.C. § 1291 in addition to § 1292, that clarification is not a necessary component of the notice of appeal. See Fed. R. App. P. 3(c)(1). The proper place to explain that position is in the brief memorandum due on April 17, 2025, in Appeal No. 25-1418 The appellants shall file, on or before April 17, 2025, a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed as unnecessary or for lack of jurisdiction. A motion for voluntary dismissal under Rule 42(b) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure will satisfy this requirement. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details). JXK [7445740][3] [3] [7445740] 25-1598 (HTP) [Entered: 04/09/2025 02:41 PM]
Related: [-]