Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Michael M Baylson
Case #: 2:25-cv-01843
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 10, 2025 10:03 AM EDT
Plaintiff
LEON WEINGRAD
Represented By
Andrew Roman Perrong
Perrong Law LLC
contact info
SELECT A PARTY
EXACT CARE PHARMACY, LLC


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 05/02 9:05 AM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S UNCONTESTED MOTION FOR A 30 DAY EXTENSION TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. DEFENDANT SHALL HAVE UP TO AND INCLUDING 6/4/2025 TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 5/2/2025.5/2/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
6 6 misc Statement Thu 05/01 7:34 PM
Statement Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EXACT CARE PHARMACY, LLC. (FAHEY, SEAN)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 05/01 7:29 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint (Attorney) filed by EXACT CARE PHARMACY, LLC.Uncontested Motion for 30-Day Extension to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint.(FAHEY, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, April 28, 2025
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 04/28 10:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by LEON WEINGRAD re: John Shinkowsky served Summons and Complaint upon EXACT CARE PHARMACY, LLC by Personally Upon Registered Agent Per FRCP 4(h)(1)(B). EXACT CARE PHARMACY, LLC served on 4/14/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. (Perrong, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
3 3 misc Notice Re: Magistrate Consent Thu 04/10 1:49 PM
Opt In Notice of Procedure to Consent to Random Magistrate Judge Assignment(nd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 04/10 1:26 PM
Summons Issued as to EXACT CARE PHARMACY, LLC. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 4/10/2025. (ahf)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Thu 04/10 9:42 AM
COMPLAINT against EXACT CARE PHARMACY, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-18207694.), filed by LEON WEINGRAD.(Perrong, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form