Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:25-cv-00721
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 10, 2025 11:05 AM EDT
Defendant
Avis Budget Car Rental, LLC
Defendant
Avis Budget Group, Inc.
Defendant
Avis Car Rental
Defendant
Hutchinson, Inc.
Defendant
PV Holding Corp
Defendant
Jules Toussaint
Plaintiff
Joanne M. Bilbrey
Represented By
Kenneth A. Calderone
Hanna, Campbell & Powell
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 19, 2025
12 12 service Return of Service Executed Mon 05/19 2:28 PM
Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Jules Toussaint on 5/17/2025, filed on behalf of Joanne M. Bilbrey (Calderone, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
11 11 service Return of Service Executed Thu 05/15 10:03 AM
Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Hutchinson, Inc., filed on behalf of Joanne M. Bilbrey (Calderone, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Return of Service Executed Thu 05/15 10:02 AM
Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Hutchinson, Inc., filed on behalf of Joanne M. Bilbrey (Calderone, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
9 9 service Return of Service Executed Tue 05/13 10:37 AM
Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Hutchinson, Inc. on 5/9/2025, filed on behalf of Joanne M. Bilbrey (Calderone, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 05/02 3:50 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Joanne M. Bilbrey. PV Holding Corp waiver sent on 5/2/2025, answer due 7/1/2025 filed on behalf of Joanne M. Bilbrey (Calderone, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 05/02 11:09 AM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Joanne M. Bilbrey. Avis Budget Group, Inc. waiver sent on 4/11/2025, answer due 6/10/2025 filed on behalf of Joanne M. Bilbrey (Calderone, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 05/02 8:44 AM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Joanne M. Bilbrey. Avis Car Rental waiver sent on 4/11/2025, answer due 6/10/2025 filed on behalf of Joanne M. Bilbrey (Calderone, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 05/02 8:42 AM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Joanne M. Bilbrey. Avis Budget Car Rental, LLC waiver sent on 4/11/2025, answer due 6/10/2025 filed on behalf of Joanne M. Bilbrey (Calderone, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
4 4 oth_evt Summons Issued Mon 04/21 9:34 AM
Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Hutchinson, Inc., Hutchinson, Inc. c/o Jack Turner, c/o James Todoroff, c/o John Meyne, PV Holding Corp, PV Holding Corp c/o Corporation Service Company, c.o Linda Ciaramella, c/o Robert E. Muhs, Jules Toussaint. (H,JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
3 3 oth_doc Request to Clerk for Service Thu 04/10 3:09 PM
Request to Clerk for service upon Hutchinson, Inc., PV Holding Corp, Jules Toussaint by certified mail. filed by Joanne M. Bilbrey.(Calderone, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Hutchinson, Inc. c/o Jack Turner,
Att: 2 Summons Hutchinson, Inc. c/o James Todoroff,
Att: 3 Summons Hutchinson, Inc. c/o John Meyne,
Att: 4 Summons Jules Toussaint,
Att: 5 Summons PV Holding c/o Corporation Service Company,
Att: 6 Summons PV Holding c/o Linda Ciaramella,
Att: 7 Summons PV Holding c/o Robert E. Muhs,
Att: 8 Summons PV Holding Corp.
2 2 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Thu 04/10 11:23 AM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summonses not provided and were not issued. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/10 10:15 AM
Complaint with jury demand against PV Holding Corp, Jules Toussaint, Avis Budget Group, Inc., Avis Car Rental, Avis Budget Car Rental, LLC, Hutchinson, Inc. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-13045818. Filed by Joanne M. Bilbrey. (Calderone, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Probate Court Letters of Authority,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Page
utility Add and Terminate Judge Thu 04/10 11:20 AM
Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Thu 04/10 11:22 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes, Jr. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]