Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Deborah L Thorne
Case #: 1:25-bk-05502
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 07, 2025

Debtor
American Tool Distributors Inc
1313 Howland Dr
Joliet, IL 60431
Represented By
Vaughn A White
Vw Law LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Acting U.S. Trustee
Adam G. Brief
Office of the U. S. Trustee, Region 11 219 South Dearborn Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604
Trustee
Gus A Paloian
Seyfarth, Shaw, Et Al 233 S. Wacker Drive Suite 8000
Chicago, IL 60606


Docket last updated: 04/10/2025 12:05 PM CDT
Thursday, April 10, 2025
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7a) Thu 04/10 9:34 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual Fee Amount $338, Filed by Vaughn A White on behalf of American Tool Distributors Inc (White, Vaughn)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 04/10 9:35 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 25-05502 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A49354656. Fee Amount $ 338.00 (McCann, Brandie) Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
3 3 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Asset Corporation) Thu 04/10 10:11 AM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/7/2025 at 12:00 PM via Zoom - Paloian: Meeting ID 606 284 9180, Passcode 0161213137, Phone 1-872-201-2698. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]