Texas Northern District Court
Judge:James Wesley Hendrix
Case #: 5:25-cv-00080
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 10, 2025 12:11 PM CDT
Defendant
Collectech Diversified, Inc.
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Plaintiff
Kasi Sierra
Represented By
Joel Spencer Halvorsen
Halvorsen Klote
contact info


Docket last updated: 39 minutes ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 05/02 2:51 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion to Extend Time. The deadline for the plaintiff to obtain local counsel is hereby extended to July 3, 2025. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 5/2/2025) (bmh)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Returned Fri 05/02 12:31 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. Waiver sent on 4/22/2025. (Halvorsen, Joel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
4 4 motion Extension of Time Thu 05/01 3:44 PM
MOTION to Extend Time to file Entry of Appearance of Local Counsel filed by Kasi Sierra (Halvorsen, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 11, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 04/11 9:20 AM
Summons Issued as to Collectech Diversified Inc, Equifax Information Services, LLC. (bmh)
Related: [-]
2 2 qcref Hendrix Fri 04/11 9:16 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bmh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/10 11:49 AM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Collectech Diversified, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC filed by Kasi Sierra. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-15413090) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Halvorsen, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Cerf of Interested Parties