New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Judge:Martin Glenn
Case #: 1:25-ap-01086
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Inmarsat Global Limited
Represented By
Charles Anthony Michael
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ligado Networks LLC
Represented By
Ligado Networks LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ligado Networks (Canada) Inc
Represented By
Ligado Networks (Canada) Inc
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
17 17 ans Opposition Thu 05/01 10:40 AM
Opposition : Plaintiffs Ligado Networks LLC And Ligado Networks (Canada) Inc.'s Memorandum Of Law In Opposition To Defendant Inmarsat Global Limited's Motion To Transfer This Proceeding To The District Of Delaware Related [+] filed by Reginald R. Goeke on behalf of Ligado Networks (Canada) Inc, Ligado Networks LLC. (Goeke, Reginald)
Related: [-] 6
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
16 16 ans Opposition Wed 04/30 8:50 PM
Opposition : Plaintiffs Ligado Networks LLC And Ligado Networks (Canada) Inc.'s Memorandum Of Law In Opposition To Defendant Inmarsat Global Limited's Motion To Transfer This Proceeding To The District Of Delaware Related [+] filed by Reginald R. Goeke on behalf of Ligado Networks (Canada) Inc, Ligado Networks LLC. (Goeke, Reginald)
Related: [-] 6
Friday, April 25, 2025
15 15 order So Ordered Stipulation Fri 04/25 12:05 PM
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 4/25/2025 Extending Time to Respond to the Complaint. The deadline for Inmarsat to respond to the Complaint is hereby extended to July 17, 2025. Related [+] (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 8
Thursday, April 24, 2025
14 14 order So Ordered Stipulation Thu 04/24 10:53 AM
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 4/24/2025 to Extend Deadline to April 30, 2025. Related [+] (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 12
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Thu 04/24 10:51 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by John M. Conlon on behalf of Ligado Networks (Canada) Inc, Ligado Networks LLC. (Conlon, John)
Related: [-] 11 ,9 ,10
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
12 12 misc Stipulation Wed 04/23 4:04 PM
Stipulation Extending Response Deadline Related [+] Filed by John M. Conlon on behalf of Ligado Networks (Canada) Inc, Ligado Networks LLC. (Conlon, John)
Related: [-] 6
Monday, April 21, 2025
11 11 ans Statement Mon 04/21 9:00 PM
Statement : Consolidated Corporate Ownership Statement And List Of Equity Security Holders filed by John M. Conlon on behalf of Ligado Networks (Canada) Inc, Ligado Networks LLC. (Conlon, John)
Related: [-]
10 10 26 pgs answer Memorandum of Law Mon 04/21 8:57 PM
Memorandum of Law In Support Of Plaintiffs Ligado Networks LLC And Ligado Networks (Canada) Inc.'s Motion To Remand filed by John M. Conlon on behalf of Ligado Networks (Canada) Inc, Ligado Networks LLC. (Conlon, John)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice, Hearing Mon 04/21 8:47 PM
Notice of Hearing : Plaintiffs Ligado Networks LLC And Ligado Networks (Canada) Inc.'s Motion To Remand filed by John M. Conlon on behalf of Ligado Networks (Canada) Inc, Ligado Networks LLC.(Conlon, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Proposed Order
Friday, April 18, 2025
8 8 misc Stipulation Fri 04/18 4:53 PM
Stipulation Extending Answer Date Related [+] Filed by Charles Michael on behalf of Inmarsat Global Limited. (Michael, Charles)
Related: [-] quest to "So Order"
Monday, April 14, 2025
7 7 notice Notice, Appearance Mon 04/14 6:30 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Charles Michael on behalf of Inmarsat Global Limited. (Michael, Charles)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Motion, Transfer Venue Mon 04/14 5:33 PM
Motion to Transfer Venue to the District of Delaware filed by Jeffrey Mark Reisner on behalf of Inmarsat Global Limited Responses due by 4/28/2025,. Related [+]
Related: [-] isner, Jeffrey
Att: 1 Exhibit Brief In Support of Motion to Transfer
Att: 2 Exhibit Michael Decl. In Support of Motion to Transfer
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. A - NY Complaint
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. B - Ligado Plan Disclosure Statement
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. C - Complaint, Ligado v. US (Ct. Claims)
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. D - Ligado BK Petition (D. Del.)
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. E - Ligado Adversary Compl. (Bankr. D. Del.)
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex. F - Motion to Dismiss Adversary Compl. (Bankr. D. Del.)
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex. G - Ligado Voluntary Dismissal of Adv. Compl. (Bankr. D. Del.)
Att: 10 Exhibit Ex. H - Redline - Ex. A (State Compl.) Against Ex. F (Adv. Compl.)
Att: 11 Exhibit Ex. I - First Day Hg. Tr. (Bankr. D. Del.)
Att: 12 Exhibit Ex. J - Ligado Motion to Authorize AST Transaction (Bankr. D. Del.)
Att: 13 Exhibit Ex. K - Inmarsat Motion to Compel Quarterly Payments (Bankr. D. Del.)
Att: 14 Exhibit Ex. L - Ligado Objection to Motion to Compel (Bankr. D. Del.)
Att: 15 Exhibit Ex. M - Ligado Proposed Ch. 11 Plan (Bankr. D. Del.)
Att: 16 Exhibit Ex. N - Ligado Financial Projections and Liquidation Analysis (Bankr. D. Del.)
Att: 17 Exhibit Ex. O - AST Transaction Documents (Public, Redacted Versions)
Att: 18 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Motion to Transfer
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Mon 04/14 5:10 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Joaquin M. C De Baca on behalf of Ligado Networks (Canada) Inc, Ligado Networks LLC. (C De Baca, Joaquin)
Related: [-] 4
Friday, April 11, 2025
4 4 notice Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Fri 04/11 1:12 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding : Notice Of Appearance And Request For Notices And Service Of Papers filed by Joaquin M. C De Baca on behalf of Ligado Networks (Canada) Inc, Ligado Networks LLC. (C De Baca, Joaquin)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Auto Notice, Pre-Trial Conference for a Removed Case Fri 04/11 9:09 AM
Notice of Pre-Trial Conference for a Removed Case with Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/4/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG), (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
2 2 notice ~Generic~ NOTICE Thu 04/10 1:42 PM
This case is related to a bankruptcy case filed in the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware: Ligado Networks LLC et al, Case Number: 25-10006 (tmh). (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Transfer Order Thu 04/10 1:07 PM
Copy of Certified Order Transferring Case No. 1:25-cv-2836 (PKC) from the U.S. District Court, S.D.N.Y. to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, S.D.N.Y. Related [+]. Nature(s) of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Filed by Ligado Networks LLC, Ligado Networks (Canada) Inc. (Pisarczyk, Gladys)
Related: [-] ceipt Number 30885018, Fee Amount $ 350.
Att: 1 Doc #1 part 2
Att: 2 Doc #1 Part 3
Att: 3 Doc #1 part 4
Att: 4 Doc #1 part 5
Att: 5 Doc #1 part 6
Att: 6 Doc #1 part 7
Att: 7 Doc #1 part 8
Att: 8 Doc #1 part 9
Att: 9 Doc #1 part 10
Att: 10 Doc #1 part 11
Att: 11 Doc #1 part 13
Att: 12 Doc #1 part 14
Att: 13 Doc #1 part 13
Att: 14 Doc #1 part 15
Att: 15 Doc #1 part 16
Att: 16 Doc #1 part 17
Att: 17 Doc #1 part 18
Att: 18 Doc #1 part 19
Att: 19 Doc #1 part 20
Att: 20 Doc #1 part 21
Att: 21 Doc #1 part 22
Att: 22 Doc #1 part 23
Att: 23 Doc #1 part 24
Att: 24 Doc #1 part 25
Att: 25 Doc #1 part 26
Att: 26 Doc #1 part 27
Att: 27 Doc #1 part 28
Att: 28 Doc #1 part 29
Att: 29 Doc #2 Civil Cover Sheet
Att: 30 Doc #3 Affidavit of Service
Att: 31 Doc #4 Transfer Order
Att: 32 SDNY DOCKET SHEET
misc Add Judge Thu 04/10 1:43 PM
Judge Martin Glenn added to the case. (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]