Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Jeffery P Hopkins
Case #: 1:25-cv-00231
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause28:1442 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Case in other court:Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, A 2501331
Last checked: Thursday Apr 10, 2025 2:09 PM EDT
Defendant
JFS 241 Kids
Defendant
YMCA West Chester Yankee Road
Defendant
Wendy's
Defendant
University Hospital / Mental Institution
Defendant
Social Security Administration
Represented By
John J. Stark
Us Attorney Office
contact info
Defendant
Princeton City School District
Defendant
Metro
Defendant
Shekita Mackey HIPAA
Defendant
Karen Lipscomb HIPAA
Defendant
Cornell Lipscomb HIPAA
Defendant
Toney Larkin (JFS), Unit Case Manager
Defendant
Kemba Credit Union
Defendant
Lorny Hyde HIPAA
Defendant
Earl Hyde
Defendant
Angie Hyde
Defendant
GE Credit Union
Defendant
First Student
Defendant
Cincinnati State Technical and Community College
Defendant
Cincinnati Childrens
Defendant
Behavioral Health Services
Defendant
Beckett Springs
Defendant
Angela Baits HIPAA / Harassment
Plaintiff
Tyana Chandler


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
22 22 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 05/02 11:41 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant GE Credit Union. (Rust, Charles)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
21 21 motion Remand to State Court Thu 05/01 4:11 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Defendant University Hospital / Mental Institution. (Paliobeis, Bill)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
20 20 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 04/22 9:50 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Princeton City School District. (LaFlamme, Ryan)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 04/22 2:07 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Defendant Cincinnati State Technical and Community College. (Kachmarik, Kaitlyn)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 04/22 10:46 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Kemba Credit Union. (Hutson, Joseph)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/22 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M Hutson for Defendant Kemba Credit Union (Hutson, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/21 2:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlyn Michelle Kachmarik for Defendant Cincinnati State Technical and Community College (Kachmarik, Kaitlyn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
15 15 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 04/17 8:49 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Beckett Springs. (Caligaris, Michael)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Affidavit Thu 04/17 3:04 PM
AFFIDAVIT (Declaration of Ayshin Yuksel in Support of SSA's Motion to Dismiss) by Defendant Social Security Administration. (Scoggins, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 2017 Alternative Service Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2024 First Waiver Request,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2024 Second Waiver Request,
Att: 4 Exhibit October 2024 Notice,
Att: 5 Exhibit November 2024 Notice
13 13 service Certificate of Service Thu 04/17 2:42 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Social Security Administration re10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ,11 Notice (Other),9 Affidavit,8 Notice of Appearance (Scoggins, Jason)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Non-Compliance of Local Rule 5.1(c) (Clerk's Notice) Thu 04/17 1:15 PM
Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket9 Affidavit, filed by Social Security Administration, and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket9 Affidavit, filed by Social Security Administration as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 4/18/2025. (kev)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/17 11:17 AM
NOTICE by Defendant Social Security Administration re10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Notice to Pro Se Litigant Required by Court's Standing Order for Civil Cases) (Scoggins, Jason)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Thu 04/17 11:15 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Responses due by 5/8/2025) by Defendant Social Security Administration. (Scoggins, Jason)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Affidavit Thu 04/17 11:05 AM
AFFIDAVIT (Declaration of Ayshin Yuksel in Support of SSA's Motion to Dismiss) by Defendant Social Security Administration. (Scoggins, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 2017 Alternative Service Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2024 First Waiver Request,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2024 Second Waiver Request,
Att: 4 Exhibit October 2024 Notice,
Att: 5 Exhibit November 2024 Notice
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/17 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Scoggins for Defendant Social Security Administration (Scoggins, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
7 7 motion Dismiss Case as Frivolous Wed 04/16 1:05 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous by Defendant YMCA West Chester Yankee Road. (Bolek, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
6 6 motion Dismiss Tue 04/15 8:39 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants JFS 241 Kids, Toney Larkin (JFS). (Bikmayev, Dmitriy)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/15 8:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dmitriy Bikmayev for Defendants JFS 241 Kids, Toney Larkin (JFS) (Bikmayev, Dmitriy)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/15 8:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela J Sears for Defendants JFS 241 Kids, Toney Larkin (JFS) (Sears, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/11 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David P Bolek for Defendant YMCA West Chester Yankee Road (Bolek, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
2 2 cmp Complaint Thu 04/10 3:10 PM
COMPLAINT against Angela Baits HIPAA / Harassment, Beckett Springs, Behavioral Health Services, Cincinnati Childrens, Cincinnati State Technical and Community College, First Student, GE Credit Union, Angie Hyde, Earl Hyde, Lorny Hyde HIPAA, JFS 241 Kids, Kemba Credit Union, Toney Larkin (JFS), Cornell Lipscomb HIPAA, Karen Lipscomb HIPAA, Shekita Mackey HIPAA, Metro, Princeton City School District, Social Security Administration, University Hospital / Mental Institution, Wendy's, YMCA West Chester Yankee Road, originally filed on 3/18/2025 in the Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A2501331) filed by Tyana Chandler. (kev)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 04/10 1:14 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, case number A 2501331, filed by Social Security Administration. (Stark, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Complaint
misc Docket Annotation Thu 04/10 3:13 PM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (kev)
Related: [-]