Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:25-bk-30474

Alabama Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Bess M Parrish Creswell
Case #: 2:25-ap-03009
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Tonyon Macha Zackery
2451 Meadowridge Ln G
Montgomery, AL 36117
Represented By
Tonyon Macha Zackery
contact info
Plaintiff
Valerie Lanier
735 Alcovy Springs Dr.
Lawrenceville, AL 30045
Represented By
Valerie Lanier
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Service - Telephone Hearing Wed 05/14 11:45 PM
BNC Certificate of Service - Telephone Hearing - Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/14/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Hearing
Monday, May 12, 2025
25 25 court Set Hearing Mon 05/12 12:45 PM
Notice of Scheduling Conference Telephone Hearing Set Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 6/10/2025 at 02:00 PM at Conference Call: (855) 244-8681, Participant Code: 23088378093, Host: Carrie Moore. (CBM)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,12 Amended Complaint,19 Answer to Complaint, Answer to Complaint
Sunday, May 11, 2025
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Service Sun 05/11 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/11/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Order
Friday, May 09, 2025
22 22 order Generic Motion Order Fri 05/09 9:33 AM
Order Granting Motion To Proceed In Forma Pauperis Related [+] Entered On 5/9/2025. (KM)
Related: [-] 13
Friday, May 02, 2025
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Service - Telephone Hearing Fri 05/02 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Service - Telephone Hearing - Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Hearing
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/02 10:46 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by Tonyon Macha Zackery Related [+]. (KM)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Valerie Lanier,12 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Valerie Lanier
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
18 18 court Set Hearing Wed 04/30 12:48 PM
Notice of Telephone Hearing Set Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 5/6/2025 at 02:00 PM at Conference Call: (855) 244-8681, Participant Code: 23088378093, Host: Carrie Moore. (CBM)
Related: [-] 17 Motion to Accept Delayed Filing
Monday, April 28, 2025
17 17 motion generic Motion (Motion) Mon 04/28 1:02 PM
Motion to Accept Delayed Filing filed by Valerie Lanier. (KM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Service - Telephone Hearing Wed 04/23 11:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Service - Telephone Hearing - Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Hearing
Monday, April 21, 2025
15 15 court Set Hearing Mon 04/21 4:11 PM
Notice of Telephone Hearing Set Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 5/6/2025 at 02:00 PM at Conference Call: (855) 244-8681, Participant Code: 23088378093, Host: Carrie Moore. (CBM)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Valerie Lanier
14 14 misc Documents (generic) Mon 04/21 4:04 PM
Submission of Documents: Application to Proceed in Distrist Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (AO 240) filed by Valerie Lanier. (DWS)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion generic Motion (Motion) Mon 04/21 4:02 PM
Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Valerie Lanier Related [+]. (DWS)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Valerie Lanier,3 Clerk's Notice of Filing Fees Due on Adversary/Notice of Removal
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 04/21 3:58 PM
Amended Complaint and cover sheet by Plaintiff Valerie Lanier, against Tonyon Macha Zackery. Related [+]. (DWS)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Valerie Lanier
10 10 notice Address Change Mon 04/21 1:28 PM
Notice of Change of Address filed by Valerie Lanier. (KC)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
9 9 court Summons Not Executed Fri 04/18 2:11 PM
7 days have passed since the issuance of summons. Notice is hereby given that pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. Proc. 7004(e), the summons issued is no longer serviceable. Upon Plaintiffs request, a new summons will be issued by the Clerk. Related [+]. (KM)
Related: [-] 4 Summons Issued
Saturday, April 12, 2025
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Service Sat 04/12 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/12/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Service Sat 04/12 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/12/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Summons Issued
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Service Sat 04/12 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/12/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Clerk's Notice of Filing Fees Due on Adversary/Notice of Removal
Thursday, April 10, 2025
4 4 court Summons Issued Thu 04/10 11:58 AM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff to be served on Defendant Tonyon Macha Zackery Date Issued 4/10/2025, Answer Due 5/2/2025. Execution of Summons to be done by 4/17/2025. (DWS)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Clerk's Notice of Filing Fee Due on Adversary/Notice of Removal Thu 04/10 11:54 AM
Valerie Lanier is to pay the outstanding fee of $350.00 for the filing of an Adversary Related [+]. Filing Fee on Adversary due by 4/18/2025. (DWS)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Valerie Lanier
2 2 1 pgs order Order Thu 04/10 11:26 AM
Order Converting Motion To Adversary Proceeding Entered On 4/10/202 Related [+]. (DWS)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Valerie Lanier
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/10 11:03 AM
Adversary case 25-03009 (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)): Complaint against Tonyon Macha Zackery . Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $350. filed by Valerie Lanier . (DWS)
Related: [-]