Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:24-bk-82198

Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Clifton R Jessup Jr
Case #: 5:25-ap-80055
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Charter Communications Holdings, LLC d/b/a Spectrum
2 Digital Place
Simpsonville, SC 29681
Plaintiff
Patrick Payne
115 Jane Dr.
Hazel Green, AL 35750
Represented By
John C. Larsen
Larsen Law, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
April Payne
115 Jane Dr.
Hazel Green, AL 35750
Represented By
John C. Larsen
Larsen Law, P.C.
contact info
Trustee
Michele T. Hatcher
Chapter 13 Trustee P.O. Box 2388
Decatur, AL 35602


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:05 PM CDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
10 10 2 pgs order Order (Generic-no hearing) Tue 05/13 3:46 PM
Tentative Ruling On The Issue of Damages Under 11 U.S.C. Section 362(k) Signed on 5/13/2025. (tcw)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Corporate Parent Disclosure Statement Tue 05/13 3:36 PM
Corporate Parent Disclosure Statement Filed by Defendant Charter Communications Holdings, LLC d/b/a Spectrum. (Hockett, Brian)
Related: [-]
8 8 court Incorrect Event (Notice of) Tue 05/13 2:41 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing or Incorrect Event: PROBLEM: The filer, Brian Hockett, Attorney for Defendant, has failed to file Corporate Parent Disclosure Statement when filing the Answer to Adversary Proceeding. SOLUTION: The filer, Brian Hockett, Attorney for Defendant, should file a Corporate Parent Disclosure Statement using the docket event located at Bankruptcy>Miscellaneous>Corporate Parent Disclosure Statement. If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may deny the requested relief, or the Clerk's Office may take no further action. Related [+]. (tcw)
Related: [-] 6 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Charter Communications Holdings, LLC d/b/a Spectrum
7 7 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/13 9:15 AM
Order Approving Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian W. Hockett, Esq. Related [+] Signed on 5/13/2025. (tcw)
Related: [-] 4
Monday, May 12, 2025
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/12 4:14 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Charter Communications Holdings, LLC d/b/a Spectrum. (Hockett, Brian)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Receipt for Pro Hac Vice Motion Mon 05/12 2:14 PM
Receipt number 17869 from District Court filing fee paid by Brian W. Hockett of Thompson Coburn LLP Related [+] (mmb)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Defendant Charter Communications Holdings, LLC d/b/a Spectrum
Friday, May 09, 2025
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/09 12:37 PM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian W. Hockett as counsel for Charter Communications Holdings, LLC d/b/a Spectrum (the correct name is Charter Communications Operating, LLC) Filed by Defendant Charter Communications Holdings, LLC d/b/a Spectrum (Hockett, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Thursday, April 17, 2025
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Thu 04/17 2:41 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. (Larsen, John)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued Charter Communications Holdings, LLC d/b/a Spectrum Date Issued 4/10/2025, Answer Due 5/12/2025 (tcw)
Thursday, April 10, 2025
2 2 cmp Summons Issued Thu 04/10 1:01 PM
Summons Issued Charter Communications Holdings, LLC d/b/a Spectrum Date Issued 4/10/2025, Answer Due 5/12/2025 (tcw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/09 4:29 PM
Adversary case 25-80055 14 Related [+]) Complaint by Patrick Payne, April Payne against Charter Communications Holdings, LLC d/b/a Spectrum. Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $350 (Larsen, John)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - BNC Certificate of Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Spectrum Text Messages
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Spectrum Call 4-4-25