Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Michael S Nachmanoff
Referred: William B Porter
Case #: 1:25-cv-00609
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Terminated:May 08, 2025
Case in other court:Arlington County, Virginia Circuit Court, 013CL25000751-00
Last checked: Thursday Apr 10, 2025 3:11 PM EDT
Defendant
Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.
100 Shockoe Slip, 2nd floor
Richmond, VA 23219
Represented By
Leland Howard Jones, IV
Lavin Rindner Duffield LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JDI Plumbing, LLC


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
10 10 order So Ordered Fri 05/09 8:25 AM
So Ordered re9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 5/8/2025. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 05/08 8:52 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. (Jones, Leland)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
8 8 respoth Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Tue 05/06 4:51 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.. (Jones, Leland)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
7 7 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Mon 04/14 1:57 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by JDI Plumbing, LLC. (Postol, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/14 1:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence P. Postol on behalf of JDI Plumbing, LLC (Postol, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 04/14 1:34 PM
ORDERED that Defendant's Motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; and it is further ORDERED that Defendant is granted leave to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before May 8, 2025 in re4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter on 4/14/2025. (swil)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 04/11 9:54 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.. (Jones, Leland)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/10 2:39 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.. (Jones, Leland)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/10 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Leland Howard Jones, IV on behalf of Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. (Jones, Leland)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 04/10 2:27 PM
Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-10115274.), filed by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc..(Jones, Leland)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Filings,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Mon 04/14 11:42 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff and US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter. (swil)
Related: [-]