Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alan D Albright
Referred: Mark Lane
Case #: 1:25-cv-00541
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Case in other court:419th District Court of Travis County, Texas, D-1-GN-25-001026
Last checked: Thursday Apr 10, 2025 2:09 PM CDT
Defendant
Schindler Elevator Corporation
Represented By
Kenneth Wayne Bullock
Frost Brown Todd LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mrs. Gooch's Natural Food Markets, Inc. d/b/a Whole Foods Market


Docket last updated: 23 minutes ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
8 8 motion Consolidate Cases Fri 05/16 6:35 PM
Agreed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Schindler Elevator Corporation.. Motions referred to Judge Mark Lane. (Bullock, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
7 7 7 pgs order Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Wed 04/16 8:37 AM
Docket Control Order Pursuant to Rules 16(b) and 26(f) with Appendix A - Joint Proposed Scheduling Order attached. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 6/10/2025 . Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (cnr)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
6 6 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Mon 04/14 4:09 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by Schindler Elevator Corporation. (Bullock, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Certificate of Service Mon 04/14 12:05 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Schindler Elevator Corporation as Supplement to 1 Notice of Removal (Bullock, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Mon 04/14 9:10 AM
ORDER that the removing party, if it has not already done so, shall within ten (10) days from the date of this order supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (kp)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Deficiency Notice Mon 04/14 9:09 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 1 Notice of Removal: Your Certificate of Service indicates ECF service on attorney for Plaintiff, who had not been added to the docket at the time of filing the Notice of Removal, and therefore had not been served via CM/ECF. Please file an Amended Certificate of Service as a SEPARATE PLEADING. Use the "Certificate of Service" event under the "Service of Process" menu. State alternate means of service to counsel. (kp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
2 2 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 04/14 9:08 AM
STANDING ORDER (dated 02 27-2025 REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (kp)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 04/10 1:48 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Schindler Elevator Corporation (Filing fee $405 receipt number ATXWDC-20028276), filed by Schindler Elevator Corporation.(Bullock, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Supplement
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/14 9:07 AM
Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Mon 04/14 9:07 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Mon 04/14 9:08 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Schindler Elevator Corporation. (kp)
Related: [-]