Mister Chimney Cleaning and Repairs, Inc.
California Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Dennis Montali |
Case #: | 3:25-bk-30283 |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2025 |
Creditor Meeting: | May 19, 2025 |
Claims Deadline: | Jun 20, 2025 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Mister Chimney Cleaning and Repairs, Inc.
1336 El Camino Real
Belmont, CA 94002-3908 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Not Assigned - SF
|
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF
Phillip J. Burton Federal Building 450 Golden Gate Ave. 5th Fl., #05-0153
San Francisco, CA 94102 |
Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago |
Tuesday, April 29, 2025 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Declaration of of Martin Nava Mendoza in Support of Motion for Use of Cash Collateral and Motion for Order Authorizing Payment of Pre-Petition Payroll, Applicable Taxes and Employee Procedures (Exhibit "1" Budget) . Filed by Debtor Mister Chimney Cleaning and Repairs, Inc. (Wood, Ryan) |
|
24 | 24
![]() Motion for Order Authorizing Payment of Pre-Petition Payroll, Applicable Taxes and Honor Pre-Petition Payroll and Employee Procedures Filed by Debtor Mister Chimney Cleaning and Repairs, Inc. (Wood, Ryan) |
|
23 | 23
![]() Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Debtor Mister Chimney Cleaning and Repairs, Inc. (Wood, Ryan) |
|
Wednesday, April 23, 2025 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Order Designating Responsible Individual [Martin Nava-Mendoza] (lp) |
|
21 | 21
![]() Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual , Schedules A-H. , Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule Filed by Debtor Mister Chimney Cleaning and Repairs, Inc. (Wood, Ryan) |
|
20 | 20
![]() Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed by Debtor Mister Chimney Cleaning and Repairs, Inc. (Wood, Ryan) |
|
Friday, April 18, 2025 | ||
19 | 19
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 04/18/2025. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, April 16, 2025 | ||
18 | 18
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - Payment of State and Fed Taxes. . Notice Date 04/16/2025. (Admin.) |
|
17 | 17
![]() Order Granting Ex Parte Application for Release of Funds Held By Wells Fargo Bank and Use of Release Funds (ccm) |
|
Tuesday, April 15, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Ex Parte Motion Order to Release Funds Held By Wells Fargo Bank and Order For Use of Funds with Wells Fargo Bank Upon Release Filed by Debtor Mister Chimney Cleaning and Repairs, Inc. (Wood, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
15 | 15
![]() Declaration of Martin Nava-Mendoze re Subchapter V Financial Disclosure Pursuant to Section 1116(A) Filed by Debtor Mister Chimney Cleaning and Repairs, Inc. (Wood, Ryan) |
|
14 | 14
![]() Application to Designate Martin Nava-Mendoza as Responsible Individual Filed by Debtor Mister Chimney Cleaning and Repairs, Inc. (Wood, Ryan) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Certificate of Service Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee and Verified Statement . Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF (Powell, Gregory) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Appointment of Trustee and Approval of Bond Trustee Christopher Hayes added to the case. Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee and Verified Statement . (Powell, Gregory) |
|
Monday, April 14, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Paul Gregory Leahy. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF (Leahy, Paul) |
|
Sunday, April 13, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 04/13/2025. (Admin.) |
|
9 | 9
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 04/13/2025. (Admin.) |
|
8 | 8
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. . Notice Date 04/13/2025. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 11, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Order for Payment of State and Federal Taxes (admin) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Order and Notice of Chapter 11 Status Conference Status Conference scheduled for 6/6/2025 at 10:00 AM in/via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Pre-Status Conference Report due by 5/23/2025 (jmb) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors, and Deadlines (Generated) (jmb) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Order to File Required Documents and Notice of Automatic Dismissal . (jmb) |
|
Thursday, April 10, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
court
Meeting of Creditors 11 (Business)
Thu 04/10 1:41 PM
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/19/2025 at 01:00 PM via UST Teleconference, Call in number/URL: 1-877-991-8832 Passcode: 4101242. Proofs of Claims due by 6/20/2025. (Wood, Ryan) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor in the Amount of $ 15000 Filed by Debtor Mister Chimney Cleaning and Repairs, Inc. (Wood, Ryan) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual, Fee Amount $1738, Filed by Mister Chimney Cleaning and Repairs, Inc.. Application to Employ Counsel by Debtor due by 05/12/2025. Order Meeting of Creditors due by 04/17/2025.Incomplete Filings due by 04/24/2025. Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan Due by 07/9/2025. (Wood, Ryan) |
|
crditcrd
none
Thu 04/10 1:41 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-30283 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00). Receipt number A33796316, amount $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) |