Florida Middle District Court
Judge:John E Steele
Referred: Kyle C Dudek
Case #: 2:25-cv-00290
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause42:4001 National Insurance Flood Act
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 10, 2025 5:09 PM EDT
Defendant
American Strategic Insurance Corp.
2 ASI Way N
St. Petersburg, FL 33702
Plaintiff
Yi Emily Wu
Represented By
Otto E. Berges
Alliance Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 05/05 3:54 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 9 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant must respond to the complaint on or before 5/20/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 5/5/2025. (BLW)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Mon 05/05 2:02 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by American Strategic Insurance Corp. identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation, Corporate Parent ARX Holding Corp. for American Strategic Insurance Corp... (Bennett, Ryan)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Mon 05/05 1:59 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Bennett, Ryan)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Mon 05/05 1:58 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Ryan Martin Bennett on behalf of American Strategic Insurance Corp.. Lead Counsel: Ryan M. Bennett. (Bennett, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Mon 04/14 2:05 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Yi Emily Wu. (Berges, Otto)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order to Strike Mon 04/14 12:22 PM
ENDORSED ORDER. Local Rule 3.03 requires that each party file a disclosure statement using the standard form from the clerk or the court's website. However, in filing Plaintiff's disclosures, Plaintiff used an outdated form. As such, the paper is deemed stricken, and the clerk is directed to delete Doc. 5 from the CM/ECF docket. By 14 days from this order, Plaintiff must refile the disclosure using the proper form, which can be found at: https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/form/disclosure-statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 4/14/2025. (BLW)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Mon 04/14 11:19 AM
STRICKEN per Endorsed Order 6. DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Yi Emily Wu. (Berges, Otto) Modified text and removed PDF on 4/14/2025 (BD)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
4 4 service Summons issued Fri 04/11 3:15 PM
SUMMONS issued as to American Strategic Insurance Corp. (KME)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Civil Action Order Fri 04/11 9:01 AM
CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/11/2025. (CGW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 04/10 4:44 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. New case number: 2:25-cv-290-JES-KCD. (RPB)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/10 4:41 PM
COMPLAINT against American Strategic Insurance Corp. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-23232745) filed by Yi Emily Wu.(Berges, Otto)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Supplement Notice of Filing Lead Counsel