California Central District Court
Judge:Michael W Fitzgerald
Referred: Sheri Pym
Case #: 5:25-cv-00884
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Case in other court:San Bernardino Superior Court, CIVSB2503842
Last checked: Thursday Apr 10, 2025 2:09 PM PDT
Defendant
Aerotek, Inc.
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
Plaintiff
Gerardo Hernandez


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
12 12 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) Tue 05/06 9:40 AM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Gerardo Hernandez pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) Only as to Aerotek, Inc.. (Freiman, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
11 11 respm Response in Support of Motion Mon 05/05 3:30 PM
RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 7 filed by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc..(Roysdon, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Reply Declaration of Nicole R. Roysdon in Support of Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint
Monday, April 28, 2025
10 10 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/28 9:09 AM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 7 filed by Plaintiff Gerardo Hernandez.(Freiman, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Request for Judicial Notice
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
9 9 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Wed 04/23 5:27 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc., re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form6 served on 04/23/2025. (Roysdon, Nicole)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Wed 04/23 5:25 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc., re Notice of Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form,,4 served on 04/23/2025. (Roysdon, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
7 7 motion Dismiss (cause or other) Tue 04/15 3:37 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/19/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Roysdon, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 Declaration,
Att: 8 Exhibit 5,
Att: 9 Exhibit 6
Monday, April 14, 2025
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 04/14 4:39 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 04/14 4:39 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
4 4 transfer Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form Mon 04/14 4:38 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for discovery. Pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:25-cv-00884 MWF (SPx). (ghap)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 04/10 2:32 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc., identifying Gerardo Hernandez, Aerotek, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Lawrence W. Freiman, Counsel for Plaintiff.(Kosch, Lois)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 04/10 2:24 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc..(Kosch, Lois)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 04/10 2:16 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVSB2503842 Receipt No: ACACDC-39482728 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attorney Lois M Kosch added to party Cardinal Health, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kosch, Lois)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Lois M. Kosch,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Declaration of Laura Garza,
Att: 6 Certificate of Service
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 04/14 4:46 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Aerotek, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Does 1 through 20, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Gerardo Hernandez. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/6/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A page 9) (ghap) Modified on 4/14/2025 (ghap)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 04/14 4:50 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gerardo Hernandez, upon Defendant Aerotek, Inc. served on 3/13/2025, answer due 4/3/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jackie M on behalf of CT Corporation System- Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/14/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A page25) (ghap)
Related: [-]
othcmp Amended Complaint Mon 04/14 4:52 PM
NON CONFORM COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Aerotek, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Does 1 through 20, inclusive amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by plaintiff Gerardo Hernandez. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B PAGE 28)(ghap)
Related: [-]