Virginia Western District Court
Judge:Thomas T Cullen
Referred: Joel C Hoppe
Case #: 7:25-cv-00239
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/16/2025 7:40 PM EDT
Friday, April 11, 2025
3 3 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC 1983; Regarding Consent to Fee; within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 4/11/2025. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party/Parties via US Mail)(aab)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
2 2 Prisoner Trust Account Report and Statements of Assets by Renae Long-Spears (jv)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against Albemarle Charlottesville Regional Jail, Anderson, M. Barnable, Bengele, Bergey, Boggs, Bowman, Burton, Clark, J. Claussen, Conver, M. Deutschman, Diaz, R. Ellisun, R. Garris, B. Gurron, J. Hahn, Huuzz, ICC Member #4, ICC Member #5, ICC Member #6, ICC Panel #3, Johnson, Martin Kumer, LaFlamme, S. Lilley, Majorga, G. Mandy, Marshall, W. Martin, McCorkle, A. Mckinnon, Milnor, T. Myamrok, Nelson, Parker, Parsley, Raveho, Rittenhouse, Saberg, Schmittenger, V. Schmittenger, T. Schwab, Taliafferro, Thomas, R. Topoc, Watts, filed by Renae Long-Spears.(jv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents