District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Beryl A Howell
Case #: 1:25-cv-01090
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 10, 2025 6:06 PM EDT
Defendant
U.S. OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT
1900 E Street, NW
Washington, DC 20415
Defendant
Nate Cavanaugh
2301 Constitution Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20037
Defendant
U.S. INSTITUTE OF PEACE
2301 Constitution Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20037
Defendant
U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
1800 F Street, NW
Washington, DC 20405
Defendant
U.S. DOGE SERVICE TEMPORARY ORGANIZATION
Eisenhower Executive Office Building 1650 17th St NW
Washington, DC 20500
Defendant
ENDOWMENT FOR THE U.S. INSTITUTE FOR PEACE
2301 Constitution Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20037
Defendant
VICE ADMIRAL PETER A. GARVIN
2301 Constitution Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20037
Defendant
Amy Gleason
736 Jackson Place, NW
Washington, DC 20503
Defendant
PETE HEGSETH
2301 Constitution Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20037
Defendant
U.S. DOGE SERVICE
736 Jackson Place, N.W
Washington, DC 20503
Defendant
Kenneth Jackson
Defendant
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
2201 C St NW
Washington, DC 20451
Defendant
TRENT MORSE
1600 Pennsylvania Ave NW
Washington, DC 20500
Defendant
DONALD TRUMP
1600 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20500
Defendant
MARCO RUBIO
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Quinlan
501 H Street, NE Suite 200
Washington, DC 20002
Plaintiff
Sasha Pippenger
501 H Street NE Suite 200
Washington, DC 20002
Plaintiff
Peace in Praxis, LLC
501 H Street, NE Suite 200
Washington, DC 20002
Plaintiff
Shira Lowinger
501 H Street, NE Suite 200
Washington, DC 20002
Plaintiff
InterMotion Media, LLC
501 H Street, NE Suite 200
Washington, DC 20002
Plaintiff
John Doe
501 H Street, NE Suite 200
Washington, DC 20002
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
501 H Street, NE Suite 200
Washington, DC 20001
Plaintiff
Chester A Crocker
501 H Street, NE Suite 200
Washington, DC 20002
Plaintiff
Brave Generation
501 H Street, NE Suite 200
Washington, DC 20002
Plaintiff
Chris Bosley
501 H Street, NE Suite 200
Washington, DC 20002

GPO Apr 17 2025
MEMORANDUM & ORDER DENYING plaintiffs' 11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. See Memorandum & Order for further details. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 17, 2025. (lcbah4)

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
35 35 2 pgs motion Discovery Fri 05/09 5:45 PM
MOTION for Discovery by MOHAMED KHALIL ABUZNAD, CHRIS BOSLEY, BRAVE GENERATION, CHESTER A. CROCKER, INTERMOTION MEDIA, LLC, SHIRA LOWINGER, PEACE IN PRAXIS, LLC, SASHA PIPPENGER, ELIZABETH QUINLAN.(Eisenberg, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 29 pgs Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 2 pgs Declaration Declaration of Daniel M. Eisenberg in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Discovery,
Att: 3 3 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 4 4 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 5 7 pgs Exhibit C,
Att: 6 4 pgs Exhibit D,
Att: 7 6 pgs Exhibit E,
Att: 8 114 pgs Exhibit F,
Att: 9 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/09 4:47 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING plaintiffs'34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ms. Margaret Turner may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing plaintiff in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 9, 2025. (lcbah4)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
34 34 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/08 5:17 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Margaret Turner, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11677737. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MOHAMED KHALIL ABUZNAD, CHRIS BOSLEY, BRAVE GENERATION, CHESTER A. CROCKER, INTERMOTION MEDIA, LLC, SHIRA LOWINGER, PEACE IN PRAXIS, LLC, SASHA PIPPENGER, ELIZABETH QUINLAN.(Eisenberg, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Margaret Turner,
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission for Margaret Turner,
Att: 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Margaret Turner
Friday, April 25, 2025
33 33 misc Transcript Fri 04/25 11:53 AM
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Beryl A. Howell held on 04 16-2025 Page Numbers: 1 - 113. Date of Issuance: 4 25-2025 Court Reporter: Elizabeth Davila, Telephone number: 202-354-3242. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the[LINK:Transcript Order Form] For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/16/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/26/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2025.(Davila, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
32 32 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/24 12:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth C. Lockwood on behalf of MOHAMED KHALIL ABUZNAD (Lockwood, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/24 10:10 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan Palmer on behalf of MOHAMED KHALIL ABUZNAD (Palmer, Meghan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/22 11:18 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Marshall Ali on behalf of MOHAMED KHALIL ABUZNAD (Ali, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 04/22 8:16 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery due by 5/9/2025. Defendants' Response due by 5/23/2025. Plaintiffs' Reply due by 5/30/2025. (zalh)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
29 29 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/21 1:49 PM
NOTICE Submitted Jointly Concerning Amended Briefing Schedule by MOHAMED KHALIL ABUZNAD, CHRIS BOSLEY, BRAVE GENERATION, CHESTER A. CROCKER, INTERMOTION MEDIA, LLC, SHIRA LOWINGER, PEACE IN PRAXIS, LLC, SASHA PIPPENGER, ELIZABETH QUINLAN re Order, (Eisenberg, Daniel)
Related: [-]
order .Order Mon 04/21 6:13 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless), upon consideration of the parties'29 Joint Submission Concerning Briefing Schedule, DIRECTING plaintiffs to file any motion for discovery by May 9, defendants to file their opposition to any such motion by May 23, and plaintiffs to file any reply by May 30, 2025. Plaintiffs may, to the extent they so desire and find appropriate, submit an amicus brief pursuant to D.D.C. LCvR 7(o) in USIP v. Jackson , 25cv804 Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 21, 2025. (lcbah4)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
28 28 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/18 2:53 PM
NOTICE Submitted Jointly Concerning Briefing Schedule by MOHAMED KHALIL ABUZNAD, CHRIS BOSLEY, BRAVE GENERATION, CHESTER A. CROCKER, INTERMOTION MEDIA, LLC, SHIRA LOWINGER, PEACE IN PRAXIS, LLC, SASHA PIPPENGER, ELIZABETH QUINLAN re25 Order, Memorandum & Opinion (Eisenberg, Daniel)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/18 10:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew G. Celli, Jr on behalf of MOHAMED KHALIL ABUZNAD, CHRIS BOSLEY, BRAVE GENERATION, CHESTER A. CROCKER, INTERMOTION MEDIA, LLC, SHIRA LOWINGER, PEACE IN PRAXIS, LLC, SASHA PIPPENGER, ELIZABETH QUINLAN (Celli, Andrew)
Related: [-]
26 26 service Electronic Summons Reissued Fri 04/18 8:30 AM
SUMMONS (15) Reissued Electronically as to All Defendants (mg)
Related: [-]
order .Order Fri 04/18 4:28 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless), DIRECTING the parties, in light of their28 Joint Submission Concerning Briefing Schedule, to submit a joint notice by Monday, April 21, 2025, at 2:00 PM, indicating whether the parties in USIP v. Jackson , 25-cv-804, have any objection to the proposal here to adopt the USIP v. Jackson parties' briefing and submit additional briefs on the same issues to be ripe on May 14, 2025. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 18, 2025. (lcbah4)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 04/18 5:06 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Joint Notice due no later than 2:00PM on 4/21/2025. (mac)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
25 25 order .Order Memorandum & Opinion Thu 04/17 6:33 PM
MEMORANDUM & ORDER DENYING plaintiffs'11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. See Memorandum & Order for further details. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 17, 2025. (lcbah4)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/17 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rachael Wyant on behalf of MOHAMED KHALIL ABUZNAD, CHRIS BOSLEY, BRAVE GENERATION, CHESTER A. CROCKER, INTERMOTION MEDIA, LLC, SHIRA LOWINGER, PEACE IN PRAXIS, LLC, SASHA PIPPENGER, ELIZABETH QUINLAN (Wyant, Rachael)
Related: [-]
23 23 cmp Request for Summons to Issue Thu 04/17 4:15 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by MOHAMED KHALIL ABUZNAD, SHIRA LOWINGER, SASHA PIPPENGER, ELIZABETH QUINLAN, INTERMOTION MEDIA, LLC, BRAVE GENERATION, CHRIS BOSLEY, PEACE IN PRAXIS, LLC, CHESTER A. CROCKER.(Eisenberg, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons as to President Donald J. Trump,
Att: 2 Summons as to Kenneth Jackson,
Att: 3 Summons as to Marco Rubio,
Att: 4 Summons as to Nate Cavanaugh,
Att: 5 Summons as to Pete Hegseth,
Att: 6 Summons as to Vice Admiral Peter Garvin,
Att: 7 Summons as to Trent Morse,
Att: 8 Summons as to the U.S. Attorney for Washington, D.C.,
Att: 9 Summons as to the U.S. Attorney General,
Att: 10 Summons as to the U.S Department of State,
Att: 11 Summons as to the U.S. DOGE Service,
Att: 12 Summons as to the U.S. DOGE Service Temporary Organization,
Att: 13 Summons as to the U.S. General Services Administration,
Att: 14 Summons as to the U.S. Institute of Peace,
Att: 15 Summons as to the U.S. Office of Personnel Management
22 22 respm Response to (non-motion) Document Thu 04/17 1:35 PM
RESPONSE re21 Response to Order of the Court, filed by NATE CAVANAUGH, PETER A. GARVIN, AMY GLEASON, PETE HEGSETH, KENNETH JACKSON, TRENT MORSE, MARCO RUBIO, DONALD TRUMP, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DOGE SERVICE, U.S. DOGE SERVICE TEMPORARY ORGANIZATION, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, U.S. INSTITUTE OF PEACE, U.S. OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT. (Escher, Sam)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/17 5:28 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING plaintiffs'20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Andrew Celli may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing plaintiffs in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 17, 2025. (lcbah4)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
21 21 respm Response to Order of the Court Wed 04/16 5:01 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, filed by MOHAMED KHALIL ABUZNAD, CHRIS BOSLEY, BRAVE GENERATION, CHESTER A. CROCKER, INTERMOTION MEDIA, LLC, SHIRA LOWINGER, PEACE IN PRAXIS, LLC, SASHA PIPPENGER, ELIZABETH QUINLAN.(Eisenberg, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Temporary Restraining Order Amendment
20 20 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/16 4:05 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Andrew G. Celli, Jr., Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11621410. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MOHAMED KHALIL ABUZNAD, CHRIS BOSLEY, BRAVE GENERATION, CHESTER A. CROCKER, INTERMOTION MEDIA, LLC, SHIRA LOWINGER, PEACE IN PRAXIS, LLC, SASHA PIPPENGER, ELIZABETH QUINLAN.(Eisenberg, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Andrew G. Celli, Jr. for Pro Hac Vice Admission,
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Andrew G. Celli, Jr.,
Att: 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Andrew G. Celli, Jr.
notice Notice of Hearing Wed 04/16 11:15 AM
NOTICE: Members of the public or media who wish to listen to live audio of the hearing scheduled for April 16, 2025 at 11:00AM ET, without physically attending the proceeding, may do so by dialing the Toll Free Number: 833-990-9400, Meeting ID: 491822013. Any use of the public access telephone line requires adherence to the general prohibition against photographing, recording, livestreaming, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference), as set out in Standing Order No. 24-31 (JEB): Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. (mac)
Related: [-]
minutes Motion Hearing Wed 04/16 2:30 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beryl A. Howell: Motion Hearing held on 4/16/2025 re11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. The Court Heard Oral Arguments From The Parties. (Court Reporter ELIZABETH DAVILA.) (mac)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/16 4:11 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING plaintiffs'19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ms. Rachael Wyant may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing plaintiffs in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 16, 2025. (lcbah4)
Related: [-]
order .Order Wed 04/16 4:31 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING plaintiffs to file by April 16, 2025 any amendments to their proposed temporary restraining order and any additional briefing regarding Dep't of Educ. v. California , 145 S. Ct. 966 (2025), as discussed in today's hearing, and DIRECTING defendants to file any response to plaintiffs' supplemental briefing by April 17, 2025 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 16, 2025. (lcbah4)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
19 19 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/15 4:34 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rachael Allison Wyant, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11618188. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MOHAMED KHALIL ABUZNAD, CHRIS BOSLEY, BRAVE GENERATION, CHESTER A. CROCKER, INTERMOTION MEDIA, LLC, SHIRA LOWINGER, PEACE IN PRAXIS, LLC, SASHA PIPPENGER, ELIZABETH QUINLAN.(Eisenberg, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Rachael Wyant,
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Rachael Wyant,
Att: 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Rachael Wyant
18 18 respm Response to motion Tue 04/15 1:52 PM
RESPONSE re11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by NATE CAVANAUGH, PETER A. GARVIN, AMY GLEASON, PETE HEGSETH, KENNETH JACKSON, TRENT MORSE, MARCO RUBIO, DONALD TRUMP, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DOGE SERVICE, U.S. DOGE SERVICE TEMPORARY ORGANIZATION, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, U.S. INSTITUTE OF PEACE, U.S. OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT.(Escher, Sam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Resolution,
Att: 2 Order,
Att: 3 Resolution,
Att: 4 Resolution,
Att: 5 GSA Form 1334,
Att: 6 Institute Letter,
Att: 7 OMB Letter,
Att: 8 Text of Proposed Order
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/15 11:06 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sam Escher on behalf of All Defendants (Escher, Sam)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/15 9:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/15 8:46 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2025 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 26A- In Person before Judge Beryl A. Howell. Defendant's Response To Plaintiff's Motion due no later than 2:00PM on 4/15/2025. (mac)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/14 6:52 PM
NOTICE in Response to April 11, 2025 Minute Order by MOHAMED KHALIL ABUZNAD, CHRIS BOSLEY, BRAVE GENERATION, CHESTER A. CROCKER, INTERMOTION MEDIA, LLC, SHIRA LOWINGER, PEACE IN PRAXIS, LLC, SASHA PIPPENGER, ELIZABETH QUINLAN re Order,,(Eisenberg, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonyms,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Memorandum in Support of Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonyms,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Redacted Affidavit of Jane Doe,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of John Doe,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Proposed Order on Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonyms
14 14 order .Order Mon 04/14 5:05 PM
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 14, 2025. (lcbah4)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Mon 04/14 4:03 PM
SUMMONS (12) Issued Electronically as to NATE CAVANAUGH, PETER A. GARVIN, PETE HEGSETH, KENNETH JACKSON, TRENT MORSE, MARCO RUBIO, DONALD TRUMP, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, U.S. OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/14 3:51 PM
NOTICE by MOHAMED KHALIL ABUZNAD, CHRIS BOSLEY, BRAVE GENERATION, CHESTER A. CROCKER, INTERMOTION MEDIA, LLC, SHIRA LOWINGER, PEACE IN PRAXIS, LLC, SASHA PIPPENGER, ELIZABETH QUINLAN re Order on Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym,,, (Ali, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Temporary Restraining Order Mon 04/14 3:44 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by MOHAMED KHALIL ABUZNAD, CHRIS BOSLEY, BRAVE GENERATION, CHESTER A. CROCKER, INTERMOTION MEDIA, LLC, SHIRA LOWINGER, PEACE IN PRAXIS, LLC, SASHA PIPPENGER, ELIZABETH QUINLAN.(Eisenberg, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit E,
Att: 8 Exhibit F,
Att: 9 Exhibit G,
Att: 10 Exhibit H,
Att: 11 Exhibit I,
Att: 12 Exhibit K,
Att: 13 Exhibit L,
Att: 14 Exhibit M,
Att: 15 Exhibit N,
Att: 16 Exhibit O,
Att: 17 Exhibit P,
Att: 18 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 19 Certificate of Service
10 10 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Mon 04/14 3:37 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by MOHAMED KHALIL ABUZNAD, CHRIS BOSLEY, BRAVE GENERATION, CHESTER A. CROCKER, INTERMOTION MEDIA, LLC, SHIRA LOWINGER, PEACE IN PRAXIS, LLC, SASHA PIPPENGER, ELIZABETH QUINLAN re8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Ali, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 04/14 3:27 PM
COMPLAINT against NATE CAVANAUGH, PETER A. GARVIN, AMY GLEASON, PETE HEGSETH, KENNETH JACKSON, TRENT MORSE, MARCO RUBIO, DONALD TRUMP, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DOGE SERVICE, U.S. DOGE SERVICE TEMPORARY ORGANIZATION, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, U.S. INSTITUTE OF PEACE, U.S. OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT with Jury Demand filed by SHIRA LOWINGER, SASHA PIPPENGER, ELIZABETH QUINLAN, INTERMOTION MEDIA, LLC, BRAVE GENERATION, CHRIS BOSLEY, PEACE IN PRAXIS, LLC, CHESTER A. CROCKER, MOHAMED KHALIL ABUZNAD.(Eisenberg, Daniel) Modified event title on 4/14/2025 (znmw).
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/14 3:55 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Beryl A. Howell. (znmw)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Error- New Case Mon 04/14 4:04 PM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR regarding1 Complaint. The following error(s) need correction: Separate and individual summonses required for remaining defendants. Please file as a Request for Summons to Issue. (znmw)
Related: [-]
order .Order Mon 04/14 5:07 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties to appear for a hearing on plaintiffs'11 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order on April 16, 2025 at 11:00 AM, in Courtroom 26A In Person before Judge Beryl A. Howell; DIRECTING defendants to file any written response to plaintiffs' motion by April 15, 2025 at 2:00 PM, and ORDERING plaintiffs to serve defendants with a copy of this Order immediately upon receipt to ensure that counsel for defendants has sufficient notice to appear at the hearing. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 14, 2025. (lcbah4)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
8 8 motion Temporary Restraining Order Fri 04/11 3:41 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by CHRIS BOSLEY, BRAVE GENERATION, CHESTER A. CROCKER, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, INTERMOTION MEDIA, LLC, SHIRA LOWINGER, PEACE IN PRAXIS, LLC, SASHA PIPPENGER, ELIZABETH QUINLAN.(Eisenberg, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Declaration Daniel Eisenberg's Declaration in Support of Temporary Restraining Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit E,
Att: 8 Exhibit F,
Att: 9 Exhibit G,
Att: 10 Exhibit H,
Att: 11 Exhibit I,
Att: 12 Exhibit J,
Att: 13 Exhibit K,
Att: 14 Exhibit L,
Att: 15 Exhibit M,
Att: 16 Exhibit N,
Att: 17 Exhibit O,
Att: 18 Exhibit P,
Att: 19 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 20 Certificate of Service
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/11 11:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan Palmer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Palmer, Meghan)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/11 11:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth C. Lockwood on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lockwood, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym Fri 04/11 11:42 AM
SEALED MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym filed by JANE DOE, JOHN DOE(Ali, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Affidavit,
Att: 3 Affidavit,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/11 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Marshall Ali on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ali, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Related Case Fri 04/11 10:39 AM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by CHRIS BOSLEY, BRAVE GENERATION, CHESTER A. CROCKER, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, INTERMOTION MEDIA, LLC, SHIRA LOWINGER, PEACE IN PRAXIS, LLC, SASHA PIPPENGER, ELIZABETH QUINLAN. Case related to Case No. 1:25-cv-00804. (Eisenberg, Daniel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Errata Fri 04/11 10:33 AM
ERRATA Correcting Complaint by CHRIS BOSLEY, BRAVE GENERATION, CHESTER A. CROCKER, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, INTERMOTION MEDIA, LLC, SHIRA LOWINGER, PEACE IN PRAXIS, LLC, SASHA PIPPENGER, ELIZABETH QUINLAN re1 Complaint,,,,.(Eisenberg, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Errata Notice of Errata
notice Notice of Error- New Case Fri 04/11 8:00 AM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR (REVISED) regarding1 Complaint. The following error(s) need correction: Invalid signature on Complaint. Please file the signed document using the event Errata. All filings must have an original signature or /s/ [Attorney Name] to represent an electronic signature of the filer. ** Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym is required for plaintiffs John and Jane Doe. ** COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmw) Modified to add error on 4/11/2025 (znmw)
Related: [-]
order Order on Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym Fri 04/11 5:39 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) Plaintiffs'5 Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as it provides an insufficient explanation as to why it is appropriate to proceed pseudonymously without even the Government's knowing Plaintiffs' identities; 2) Within fourteen days of the Court's Order, Plaintiffs shall file either a new Motion that addresses this issue or a Notice advising the Clerk of the Court whether they wish to proceed under their true names, and, if so, they shall also file their5 Motion on the public docket as an appendix to that Notice; and 3) If Plaintiffs do not file a new Motion or such Notice within fourteen days, the Clerk is directed to terminate the case. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/11/2025. (lcjeb4)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/10 11:15 PM
COMPLAINT against Nate Cavanaugh, ENDOWMENT FOR THE U.S. INSTITUTE FOR PEACE, PETER A. GARVIN, Amy Gleason, PETE HEGSETH, Kenneth Jackson, TRENT MORSE, MARCO RUBIO, DONALD TRUMP, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DOGE SERVICE, U.S. DOGE SERVICE TEMPORARY ORGANIZATION, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, U.S. INSTITUTE OF PEACE, U.S. OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11607131) filed by Jane Doe, Shira Lowinger, Sasha Pippenger, John Doe, Elizabeth Quinlan, InterMotion Media, LLC, Brave Generation, Chris Bosley, Peace in Praxis, LLC, Chester A Crocker.(Eisenberg, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons U.S. DOGE Service Temporary Organization,
Att: 3 Summons U.S. Department of State,
Att: 4 Summons U.S. General Services Administration,
Att: 5 Summons Kenneth Jackson,
Att: 6 Summons Donald J. Trump,
Att: 7 Summons Amy Gleason,
Att: 8 Summons U.S. Attorney General,
Att: 9 Summons U.S Attorney for Washington D.C.,
Att: 10 Summons Trent Morse,
Att: 11 Summons Pete Hegseth,
Att: 12 Summons Peter Garvin,
Att: 13 Summons Nate Cavanaugh,
Att: 14 Summons Marco Rubio,
Att: 15 Summons U.S. Office of Personnel Management