Kansas District Court
Judge:Julie A Robinson
Referred: Teresa J James
Case #: 2:25-cv-02188
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Case in other court:District Court of Wyandotte County, Kansas, WY-2025-CV-000174
Last checked: Thursday Apr 10, 2025 5:09 PM CDT
Defendant
ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
Meredith Ashlee Webster
Kutak Rock Llp - Kansas City
contact info
Plaintiff
Jakobe Furniture, LLC
Represented By
Andrew M. DeMarea
Forsgren Fisher Mccalmont Demarea Tysver LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
11 11 misc Designation of Place of Trial Fri 05/02 1:56 PM
DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Jakobe Furniture, LLC - trial to be held in Kansas City. (DeMarea, Andrew)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/02 1:55 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jakobe Furniture, LLC identifying None as corporate parent . (DeMarea, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
9 9 order Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling Mon 04/14 1:56 PM
INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 6/2/2025 at 10:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Dial CONFERENCE NUMBER: 913-423-1010 and enter CONFERENCE ID: 454 817 451. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 5/19/2025. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 5/27/2025. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 5/27/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/14/2025. (kf)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/14 12:18 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Webster, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Policy
7 7 misc Entry of Appearance Mon 04/14 10:23 AM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Dennis Dean Kirk, II on behalf of ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Kirk, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Service Fri 04/11 2:53 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Defendant's Notice of Removal(Webster, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - File Stamped State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal
Thursday, April 10, 2025
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/10 3:27 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company identifying INA Holdings Corporation; Chubb INA Holdings LLC as corporate parent . (Webster, Meredith)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Designation of Place of Trial Thu 04/10 3:25 PM
DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Webster, Meredith)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc State Court Records Thu 04/10 3:24 PM
STATE COURT RECORDS from District Court of Wyandotte County, Kansas. (Webster, Meredith)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/10 3:22 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Webster, Meredith)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 04/10 3:22 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Wyandotte County, Kansas, case number WY-2025-CV-000174 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $405, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6628664.), filed by ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Webster, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Petition,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - KS SOS LLC info report,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - NAIC ACE Lookup
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Thu 04/10 4:57 PM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at https://www.uscourts.gov/file/459/download (nac)
Related: [-]