Louisiana Middle District Court
Judge:Brian A Jackson
Referred: Richard L Bourgeois, Jr
Case #: 3:25-cv-00306
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 10, 2025 5:06 PM CDT
Defendant
ABC Insurance Company
Defendant
Cajun Industries, LLC
Defendant
John Doe
Defendant
JOEL FISHER, SR.
Defendant
KZJV, LLC
Defendant
Performance Contractors, Inc.


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/08 4:50 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by KZJV, LLC.(Vandenweghe, Roland)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
7 7 order 90 Day Conference Order Tue 04/29 4:49 PM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: A Telephone Scheduling Conference is set for 6/18/2025 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Counsel for Plaintiff(s) shall initiate the call to all parties then contact the Court at (225) 389-3602. Status Report due by 6/4/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/29/2025. (SGO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
6 6 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 04/22 11:58 AM
ORDER granting5 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Plead. Defendant KZJV, LLC is granted an extension of time until 5/8/2025 to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/22/2025. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
utility 1- Motion(s) Referred Fri 04/18 1:23 PM
MOTION(S) REFERRED:5 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time To File Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
5 5 motion Extension of Time Thu 04/17 5:30 PM
Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time To File Responsive Pleadings by KZJV, LLC(Vandenweghe, Roland)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order granting Motion for Extension of Time to Plead
Friday, April 11, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned (Conflict Checking ONLY) Fri 04/11 10:49 AM
Case reassigned to Judge Brian A. Jackson. Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (NLT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
4 4 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/10 8:39 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by KZJV, LLC (Vandenweghe, Roland)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/10 8:34 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by KZJV, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Zachry Industrial, Inc., Corporate Parent KBR Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Corporate Parent KBR, Inc. for KZJV, LLC. (Vandenweghe, Roland)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Persons Thu 04/10 8:31 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by KZJV, LLC identifying Affiliate/Interested Person Cajun Industries, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Zachry Industrial, Inc., Affiliate/Interested Person Lauren Cavalier, Affiliate/Interested Person KBR Holdings, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Dudley Debosier Injury Lawyers, Affiliate/Interested Person JOEL FISHER, Affiliate/Interested Person Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person KBR, Inc., Affiliate/Interested Person Performance Contractors, Inc. for KZJV, LLC. (Vandenweghe, Roland)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (Complete Case Opening First) Thu 04/10 8:18 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT FOR PARISH OF EAST BATON ROUGE, Case Number C-759450. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAMDC-2887399), filed by KZJV, LLC.(Vandenweghe, Roland)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - STATE COURT RECORD,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - PERFORMANCE'S NOTICE OF CONSENT TO REMOVAL,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - CAJUN'S NOTICE OF CONSENT TO REMOVAL,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - STATE COURT NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - DECLARATION OF DUANCE BUNCE,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - DECLARATION OF LORINDA CASTOR,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - DECLARATION OF LISA HEARN,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY VANDENWEGHE,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - DECLARATION OF STEPHEN BRADLEY DAVIS,
Att: 10 Exhibit CIVIL COVER FILING SHEET