California Central District Court
Judge:Hernan D Vera
Referred: Pedro V Castillo
Case #: 2:25-cv-03180
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 25VECV01323
Last checked: Thursday Apr 10, 2025 6:02 PM PDT
Defendant
Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Represented By
Sabrina Celia Narain
Ltl Attorneys LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Hakob Elizlaryan


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
9 9 9 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Mon 05/05 8:59 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Hernan D. Vera. Scheduling Conference set for 6/3/2025 at 10:00 AM. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 04/29 4:25 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera. (wm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
7 7 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Wed 04/16 3:27 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Mercedes Benz USA, LLC, served on 4/15/25.(Narain, Sabrina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - MBUSA Notice to State Court re Removal,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - MBUSA Email to Adverse Party
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 04/15 11:58 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (mza)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 04/15 11:58 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (mza)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 04/15 11:57 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Hernan D. Vera and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (mza)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 04/10 5:15 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, (Narain, Sabrina)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 04/10 5:14 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Narain, Sabrina)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 04/10 5:13 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 25VECV01323 Receipt No: ACACDC-39486086 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attorney Sabrina Celia Narain added to party Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC(pty:dft))(Narain, Sabrina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Sabrina Narain in support of Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-State Court Pleadings
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 04/15 11:51 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Mercedes Benz USA, LLC. Jury Demanded. Filed by Plaintiff Hakob Elizlaryan. [FILED IN STATE COURT 3/10/25. SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO 2. EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (mza)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Tue 04/15 11:54 AM
NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Mercedes Benz USA, LLC. [FILED IN STATE COURT 4/10/25. SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (mza)
Related: [-]