New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Nancy Hershey Lord
Case #: 1:25-bk-41775
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 22, 2025

Debtor
11691 Beach Corporation
1055 B 22nd Stret Far Rockaway
NY, NY 11691
Represented By
11691 Beach Corporation
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Richard J. McCord
Certilman Balin Adler & Hyman 90 Merrick Avenue
East Meadow, NY 11554
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn) Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green Room 510
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 04/11/2025 12:03 AM EDT
Thursday, April 10, 2025
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Auto Thu 04/10 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Filing Fee - $338.00. Receipt Number 80273778. (YR) (admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Thu 04/10 1:24 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non Individuals. Fee Amount $ 338 Filed by 11691 Beach Corporation (ylr)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Judge - Trustee - 341 Meeting Assignment (Chapter 7 Business No Asset) (Auto Assign) Thu 04/10 1:25 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Business Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee, McCord, Richard J., with 341(a) Meeting to be held on 5/22/2025 at 10:00 AM at Zoom.us/join - McCord: Meeting ID 554 489 0191, Passcode 8004435576, Phone 1 (516)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Copy of Required Photo Identification for Filer Thu 04/10 1:27 PM
Copy of Required Photo Identification pursuant to Administrative Order No. 653 for Filer Brown, Tanisha (ylr)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Deficient Filing Chapter 7 Thu 04/10 1:31 PM
Deficient Filing Chapter 7: Voluntary Petition [Pages 1-8] To answer question #8; To include title of authorized representative due by 4/10/2025. Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 4/10/2025. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 4/10/2025. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 4/10/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 4/24/2025. Schedule A/B due 4/24/2025. Schedule D due 4/24/2025. Schedule E/F due 4/24/2025. Schedule G due 4/24/2025. Schedule H due 4/24/2025. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 4/24/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 4/24/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 4/24/2025. (ylr)
Related: [-]