West Virginia Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:B Mckay Mignault
Case #: 2:25-bk-20075
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$50,001 to $100,000
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Chandler Solutions, LLC
2250 Roxalana Road 2250 Roxalana Road
Dunbar, WV 25064
Represented By
Joseph W. Caldwell
Caldwell & Riffee
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
2025 Robert C. Byrd U.S. Courthouse 300 Virginia Street, East
Charleston, WV 25301


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Fri 04/25 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. Related Document:18 Notice of Hearing on Document. Notice Date 04/24/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/25 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related Document:16 Notice of Motion/Application to Employ Professional. Notice Date 04/24/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/25 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related Document:15 Notice of Motion/Application to Employ Professional. Notice Date 04/24/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Appearance and Request for Service Under BR 9010 Thu 04/24 1:54 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service filed by Steven Leftridge Thomas, Counsel for f/k/a Bank of Mingo Guaranty Bank with Certificate of Service. (Thomas, Steven)
Related: [-]
court Uploaded Creditors Thu 04/24 6:30 AM
Creditor(s) added by Riley, Valerie . (admin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
18 18 court Hearing Set/Cnt/Rsch (Document) Tue 04/22 9:31 AM
Notice of Hearing Scheduled for 5/14/2025 at 01:30 PM at Bankruptcy Courtroom, Room 6200 Charleston. Related Document:9 Application by Debtor Chandler Solutions, LLC to Employ Joseph W. Caldwell as Counsel for the Debtor and12 Application by Debtor Chandler Solutions, LLC to Employ Michelle Steele as Bookkeeper. Transmitted to BNC with Instructions for Mailing. (Bailey, Tonya)
Related: [-]
17 17 court Notice to Clarify Filing Tue 04/22 9:28 AM
Notice to Clarify Filing. Clarification is needed concerning9 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Chandler Solutions, LLC;10 Affidavit filed by Debtor Chandler Solutions, LLC;11 Proposed Order filed by Debtor Chandler Solutions, LLC;13 Affidavit filed by Debtor Chandler Solutions, LLC; and14 Proposed Order filed by Debtor Chandler Solutions, LLC. These documents identify this case as being filed as a Chapter 11 with a designation as Subchapter V; however, the Petition does not indicate such designation. Additionally,9 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Chandler Solutions, LLC, refers to this case as being filed in the Northern District of West Virginia and should be corrected to reflect the proper venue. Transmitted to BNC with Instructions for Mailing. (Bailey, Tonya)
Related: [-]
16 16 court Notice of Motion/Application to Employ Professional Tue 04/22 6:30 AM
Court's Notice of Motion/Application to Employ Professional. Objection Deadline: 05/13/2025. Related Document12 Application to Employ. Transmitted to BNC with Instructions for Mailing. (admin)
Related: [-]
15 15 court Notice of Motion/Application to Employ Professional Tue 04/22 6:30 AM
Court's Notice of Motion/Application to Employ Professional. Objection Deadline: 05/13/2025. Related Document9 Application to Employ. Transmitted to BNC with Instructions for Mailing. (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
14 14 misc Proposed Order Mon 04/21 3:32 PM
PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Debtor Chandler Solutions, LLC Re:12 Application to Employ. (Caldwell, Joseph)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Affidavit Mon 04/21 3:31 PM
Affidavit of Debtor Chandler Solutions, LLC Re:12 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Chandler Solutions, LLC Affidavit of Disinterest of Michelle Steele as Bookkeeper for Debtor . (Caldwell, Joseph)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Employ Mon 04/21 3:29 PM
Application by Debtor Chandler Solutions, LLC to Employ Michelle Steele as Bookkeeper with Certificate of Service. (Caldwell, Joseph)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Proposed Order Mon 04/21 3:27 PM
PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Debtor Chandler Solutions, LLC Re:9 Application to Employ. (Caldwell, Joseph)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Affidavit Mon 04/21 3:26 PM
Affidavit of Debtor Chandler Solutions, LLC Re:9 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Chandler Solutions, LLC Affidavit of Disinterest of Counsel for Debtor . (Caldwell, Joseph)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Employ Mon 04/21 3:24 PM
Application by Debtor Chandler Solutions, LLC to Employ Joseph W. Caldwell as Counsel for the Debtor with Certificate of Service. (Caldwell, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 19, 2025
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sun 04/20 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related Document:6 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11. Notice Date 04/19/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 04/19 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related Document:5 Chapter 11 Operating Order. Notice Date 04/18/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
6 6 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Thu 04/17 9:56 AM
Meeting of Creditors to be held on 5/13/2025 at 10:00 AM via Telephone Conference (U.S. Trustee). Dischargeability Complaints Due: 7/14/2025. Proof of Claims Due: 8/11/2025. Transmitted to BNC with Instructions for Mailing. (Bailey, Tonya) Modified text on 4/17/2025 (Bailey, Tonya)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
5 5 order Chapter 11 Operating Order Wed 04/16 9:05 AM
Chapter 11 Operating Order for Small Business Chapter 11 Debtor. Transmitted to BNC with Instructions for Mailing. (Bailey, Tonya)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
4 4 notice Appearance and Request for Service Under BR 9010 Fri 04/11 11:50 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service filed by Elizabeth Kavitz, Counsel for United States Trustee. (Kavitz, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
court Uploaded Creditors Fri 04/11 6:30 AM
Creditor(s) added by Caldwell, Joseph W.. (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
2 2 misc Corporate Resolution Thu 04/10 9:43 PM
Corporate Resolution filed by Debtor Chandler Solutions, LLC. (Caldwell, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 40 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 04/10 9:39 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition - Missing Documents Due Within 14 Days: Chapter 11 Plan Due: 10/7/2025. Disclosure Statement. Disclosure Statement Due 10/7/2025. Assets: $79,000, Liabilities: $961,883.63 (Caldwell, Joseph) Modified text on 4/11/2025 (Bailey, Tonya)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto Docket of Credit Card Thu 04/10 9:41 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:2:25-bk-20075] ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A4283307, Amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]