JBL ELECTRIC, INC v. THE WHITING-TURNER CONTRACTING COMPANY et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Michael A Shipp |
Referred: | Justin T Quinn |
Case #: | 3:25-cv-02566 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1330 Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2025 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 5:56 AM EDT |
Defendant
PRIDE ENTERPRISES, INC.
700 E Main St Suite 204
Norristown, PA 19401 |
|
Defendant
THE WHITING TURNER CONTRACTING COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
WHITING-TURNER / PRIDE ENTERPRISES JV
|
|
Plaintiff
JBL ELECTRIC, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 06, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin T. Quinn on 5/6/2025. (kht) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 05/06 8:28 AM
Set Deadlines as to9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, . Motion set for 6/2/2025 before Magistrate Judge Justin T. Quinn. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (kht) |
||
Monday, May 05, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (ZAITA, NICHOLAS) |
|
Thursday, April 24, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by JBL ELECTRIC, INC.. PRIDE ENTERPRISES, INC. served on 4/14/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. (KRAUSS, AARON) |
|
7 | 7
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by JBL ELECTRIC, INC.. THE WHITING TURNER CONTRACTING COMPANY served on 4/14/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. (KRAUSS, AARON) |
|
6 | 6
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by JBL ELECTRIC, INC.. (KRAUSS, AARON) |
|
5 | 5
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by JBL ELECTRIC, INC.. WHITING-TURNER / PRIDE ENTERPRISES JV served on 4/14/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. (KRAUSS, AARON) |
|
Thursday, April 10, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() SUMMONS ISSUED as to PRIDE ENTERPRISES, INC., THE WHITING TURNER CONTRACTING COMPANY, WHITING-TURNER / PRIDE ENTERPRISES JV. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dmr3) |
|
qc
QC - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 04/10 11:48 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: D/B/A parties should be added as an ALIAS . Please do not enter them in the First or Last Name Fields . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, ) |
||
qc
QC - Updating Account
Thu 04/10 12:20 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The1 COMPLAINT submitted by AARON KRAUSS on 4/9/2025 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (dmr3) |
||
Wednesday, April 09, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 04/10 12:17 PM
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Justin T. Quinn added. (dmr3) |