Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Sean D Jordan
Referred: Bill Davis
Case #: 4:25-cv-00369
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 2:16 AM CDT
Defendant
Eaton Corporation
Defendant
Brian Johnson
Plaintiff
Andre L. Ibrahim
luckdoeson@hotmail.com 1016 N. Brents Ave.
Sherman, TX 75090


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 04/28 2:54 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eaton Corporation, Brian Johnson. Eaton Corporation waiver sent on 4/25/2025, answer due 6/24/2025; Brian Johnson waiver sent on 4/25/2025, answer due 6/24/2025. (Brown, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
utility Remark Mon 04/21 11:25 AM
Filing fee received in the amount of $405.00, receipt #600069106. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
3 3 misc Non-Pris Pro Se Consent to Receive Electronic Notice Thu 04/10 1:29 PM
Non-prisoner pro se consent to receive electronic notice filed by Andre L. Ibrahim. (jmb)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 04/10 1:28 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan and referred to Magistrate Judge Bill Davis. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate referral
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/10 1:25 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Andre L. Ibrahim.(jmb)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Thu 04/10 1:29 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (jmb)
Related: [-]