California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Scott C Clarkson
Case #: 8:25-bk-10923
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 20, 2025

Debtor
Clover & Co., Inc.
76 Gainsboro
Irvine, CA 92620-2187
Represented By
Sanaz Sarah Bereliani
Bereliani Law Firm, PC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Richard A Marshack (TR)
Marshack Hays Wood LLP 870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 04/11/2025 12:10 AM PDT
Thursday, April 10, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 04/10 1:28 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:8:25-bk-10923] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58273916. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 13 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Thu 04/10 12:54 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Clover & Co., Inc. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 04/24/2025. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 04/24/2025. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 04/24/2025. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 04/24/2025. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 04/24/2025. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 04/24/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 04/24/2025. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 04/24/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 04/24/2025. (Bereliani, Sanaz). See docket entry #6 for correction. Deadline Terminated Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer. Modified on 4/10/2025 (TS)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corp Resolution Auth Filing Thu 04/10 12:57 PM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor Clover & Co., Inc.. (Bereliani, Sanaz)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Thu 04/10 1:12 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Marshack (TR), Richard A with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/20/2025 at 08:00 AM via Zoom - Marshack: Meeting ID 224 236 8893, Passcode 7892402221, Phone 1 657 222 4213. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account) Notice not generated. See docket entry #5 for correct notice. Modified on 4/10/2025 (TS)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corp Resolution Auth Filing Thu 04/10 2:15 PM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor Clover & Co., Inc.. (Bereliani, Sanaz)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset/No POC) (309A/309C) Thu 04/10 2:56 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Richard A Marshack (TR) with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/20/2025 at 08:00 AM at Zoom - Marshack: Meeting ID 224 236 8893, Passcode 7892402221, Phone 1 657 222 4213. (TS)
Related: [-]
6 6 court Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required Thu 04/10 2:58 PM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Incorrect schedules/statements recorded as deficient. THE PROPER DEFICIENCY HAS BEEN ISSUED. Related [+] (TS)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Clover & Co., Inc.
7 7 misc To comply BK Rule 1007/3015(b) - Ch 7/13 (manual - deforco) (BNC) Thu 04/10 3:06 PM
ORDER to comply with bankruptcy rule 1007/3015(b) and notice of intent to dismiss case (BNC) Related [+] (TS)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Clover & Co., Inc.
8 8 misc Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (manual - ccdn) (BNC) Thu 04/10 3:07 PM
Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC) Related [+] Notice Not Generated. (TS)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Clover & Co., Inc.