California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Scott C Clarkson
Case #: 8:25-bk-10935
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 21, 2025

Debtor
Icemc Inc.
555 Anton Blvd Ste 150
Costa Mesa, CA 92626-7036
Represented By
Meng Yiren Li
Sapiens Law, Inc.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Karen S Naylor (TR)
Karen Sue Naylor, Trustee 4910 Birch Street, Suite 120
Newport Beach, CA 92660
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 04/11/2025 12:11 AM PDT
Thursday, April 10, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 04/10 7:25 PM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload([LINK:8:25-bk-10935] ) [caseupld,1027u] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58276520. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 caseupld Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload Thu 04/10 7:16 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount filed by Meng Yiren Li of Sapiens Law, Inc. on behalf of Icemc Inc.. (Li, Meng)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Tax Documents Thu 04/10 7:20 PM
Tax Documents for the Year for 2023 Filed by Debtor Icemc Inc.. (Li, Meng)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Thu 04/10 7:42 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Naylor (TR), Karen S with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/21/2025 at 09:00 AM via Zoom - Naylor: Meeting ID 506 522 8452, Passcode 9524534563, Phone 1 657 222 4281. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]