Mississippi Southern District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00011
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 2:29 AM CDT
Defendant
Regino Mayahua-Mayahua (1)
Represented By
Craig Thomas Rose - FPD
Federal Public Defender - Gulfport
contact info
Interested Party
Probation Hattiesburg
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Shundral Hobson Cole-Federal Gov
U. S. Attorney'S Office - Gulfport
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/11/2025 3:28 AM CDT
Friday, March 14, 2025
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker:Initial Appearance as to Regino Mayahua-Mayahua held on 3/14/2025. The interpreter was sworn. Defendant was sworn and he was advised of his rights, the charges against him, and maximum penalties. The government moved for detention. Defendant requested additional time for the preliminary and detention hearings and the parties did not object to combining the hearings. The court set the hearings for 3/17/25 at 2:00 p.m. The court reminded the parties of the Brady obligations. Defendant was detained pending further order and he was remanded to the custody of the U.S.Marshal. APPEARANCES: Shundral Cole, AUSA; Craig Rose, AFPD; Jason Alexis, USPO; Stephen Newell and B J. Nix, DUSM; Tony Davis, CSO; JC Diaz, Interpreter. (1:35 pm 1:50 pm) Tape Number: Audio 3.14.25. (KPM) Modified on 3/19/2025 (KPM). [2:25-mj-00013-MTP]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Regino Mayahua-Mayahua (1). (KPM) [2:25-mj-00013-MTP]
Related: [-]
3 3 *RESTRICTED* CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Regino Mayahua-Mayahua (KPM) [2:25-mj-00013-MTP]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Regino Mayahua-Mayahua. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on March 14, 2025 (KPM) [2:25-mj-00013-MTP]
Related: [-]
5 5 BRADY ORDER as to Regino Mayahua-Mayahua. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on March 14, 2025 (KPM) [2:25-mj-00013-MTP]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER Schuduling a Detention Hearing as to Regino Mayahua-Mayahua. Preliminary and Detention Hearings set for 3/17/2025 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on March 14, 2025 (KPM) Modified on 3/14/2025 (KPM). [2:25-mj-00013-MTP]
Related: [-]
7 7 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on March 14, 2025 as to Regino Mayahua-Mayahua. (KPM) Modified on 3/14/2025 (KPM). [2:25-mj-00013-MTP]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker:Preliminary Hearing as to Regino Mayahua-Mayahua held on 3/17/2025, Detention Hearing as to Regino Mayahua-Mayahua held on 3/17/2025. The interpreter was sworn. The parties agreed to combine the hearings. The government called Thomas Bailey, ICE. The pre-trial services report was admitted under seal as G1. The parties rested. The court found there is probable cause to support the allegations of the complaint. Defendant was ordered detained and he was remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. APPEARANCES: Stan Harris, AUSA; Craig Rose, AFPD; Jason Alexis, USPO; Laura Reagan and Shelley Boone, DUSM; Joseph Johnson, CSO; Balbina Caldwell, Interpreter. (2:05 pm 2:30 pm) Tape Number: Audio 3.17.25. (KPM) [2:25-mj-00013-MTP]
Related: [-]
8 8 SEALED HEARING EXHIBIT - GOVERNMENT 1 to proceedings held 3/17/25 as to Regino Mayahua-Mayahua. (KPM) [2:25-mj-00013-MTP]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Regino Mayahua-Mayahua. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on March 17, 2025 (KPM) [2:25-mj-00013-MTP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
10 10 Redacted Indictment as to Regino Mayahua-Mayahua (1) count(s) 1. (CAD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Maximum Penalty,
Att: 2 Criminal Cover Sheet
11 11 *RESTRICTED* DOCUMENT (Unredacted Indictment) as to Regino Mayahua-Mayahua.(CAD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Maximum Penalty,
Att: 2 Criminal Cover Sheet
12 12 Praecipe for Summons by USA as to Regino Mayahua-Mayahua. (CAD)
Related: [-]