Oklahoma Northern District Court
Case #: 4:25-cr-00120
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 2:19 AM CDT
Defendant
Oscar Najera-De La Cruz (1)
Represented By
Matthew Jason Primm
Haven Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Ammon Brisolara
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/11/2025 3:10 AM CDT
Thursday, March 13, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT approved by Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary by USA as to Oscar Najera-Del La Cruz (1) (mm, Dpty Clk) [4:25-mj-00190-PJC]
Related: [-]
2 2 WARRANT Issued by Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary as to Oscar Najera-Del La Cruz (mm, Dpty Clk) [4:25-mj-00190-PJC]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
3 3 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Oscar Najera-Del La Cruz (Brisolara, Ammon) [4:25-mj-00190-PJC]
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION for Hearing Related [+] by USA as to Oscar Najera-Del La Cruz (Brisolara, Ammon) [4:25-mj-00190-PJC]
Related: [-] 3 MOTION for Detention
5 5 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman: Initial Appearance held on 3/14/2025 , appointing CJA attorney Matthew Jason Primm for Oscar Najera-Del La Cruz, interpreter(s) Arthur Dixon present, ordering defendant be detained, ruling on motion(s)/document(s): #3 & #4 moot as to Oscar Najera-Del La Cruz Related [+] (Court Reporter: C1) (tjc, Dpty Clk) [4:25-mj-00190-PJC]
Related: [-] 3 MOTION for Detention ,4 MOTION for Hearing
6 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman , appointing CJA attorney as to Oscar Najera-Del La Cruz (tjc, Dpty Clk) [4:25-mj-00190-PJC]
Related: [-]
7 7 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by Oscar Najera-Del La Cruz (tjc, Dpty Clk) [4:25-mj-00190-PJC]
Related: [-]
8 8 WAIVER of Detention Hearing and CONSENT to Order of Detention Pending Further Proceedings; ORDER of Detention approved by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman by Oscar Najera-Del La Cruz (tjc, Dpty Clk) [4:25-mj-00190-PJC]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman re: Brady as to Oscar Najera-Del La Cruz (tjc, Dpty Clk) [4:25-mj-00190-PJC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
10 10 DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET(S) by USA as to Oscar Najera-De La Cruz (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
11 11 INDICTMENT by USA as to Oscar Najera-De La Cruz (1) count(s) 1 (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
12 12 SEALED UNREDACTED VERSION of Dkt #11 per FRCrP 49.1(f) (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]