Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 4:25-cr-00160
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2025
Terminated:Apr 08, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 2:31 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Bobby Joe Gamez (1)
Terminated: 04/08/2025


Docket last updated: 04/11/2025 3:32 AM CDT
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
1 1 TRANSFER OF JURISDICTION for Supervision of Releasee Bobby Joe Gamez. Received certified copies of indictment, judgment and docket sheet from Middle District of Louisiana - Baton Rouge Division, filed. (abb4)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Judgment,
Att: 2 Indictment,
Att: 3 MDLA Docket Sheet
2 2 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Bobby Joe Gamez, filed. (abb4)
Related: [-]