California Southern District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-08279
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 12:22 AM PDT
Defendant
Yesenia Cardenas-Lopez (1)
Represented By
Marina Lillian Henri
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Defendant
Ashley Mendez-Lopez (2)
Represented By
Maria Fernanda Ezquerro
Ezquerro Law Group
contact info
Jason C. Amavisca
Law Office Of Jason C. Amavisca, Esq.
contact info
Material Witness
E.M.A.
Represented By
Stacey A Kartchner
Law Office Of Stacey A Kartchner
contact info
Material Witness
R.M.A.
Represented By
Stacey A Kartchner
Law Office Of Stacey A Kartchner
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/11/2025 1:15 AM PDT
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
Arrest of Yesenia Cardenas-Lopez, Ashley Mendez-Lopez (no document attached) (ccc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Yesenia Cardenas-Lopez, Ashley Mendez-Lopez. (Copies provided to Counsel in Court). Initial Appearance set for 4/9/2025 in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr. Preliminary Hearing set for 4/22/2025 10:00 AM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr. Arraignment set for 5/6/2025 10:00 AM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr. Arraignment of JV Material Witness set for 4/14/2025 in San Diego before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg.(ccc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Rap Sheet
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr: Attorney Stacey A Kartchner for R.M.A. and E.M.A. added. (no document attached) (ccc)
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr: Initial Appearance as to Yesenia Cardenas-Lopez, Ashley Mendez-Lopez held on 4/9/2025. Oral financial proffer submitted. Written Brady Order filed. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Yesenia Cardenas-Lopez, Maria Fernanda Ezquerro, and Jason C. Amavisca for Ashley Mendez-Lopez. MW counsel confirmed. Preliminary Hearing set for 4/22/25 at 10:00am in El Centro before Magistrate Lupe Rodriguez Jr. Arraignment set for 5/06/25 at 10:00am in El Centro before Magistrate Lupe Rodriguez Jr. Bond set as to Yesenia Cardenas-Lopez (1) $15,000 P/S 1FRRA and Ashley Mendez-Lopez (2) $10,000 P/S 1FRRA. As required by Rule 5(f), the US is ordered to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges and contempt proceedings.(Interpreter Maria Cruz). (CD# 4/9/2025 LR 25: 2:02-2:25(1), 2:01-2:28 (2)). (Plaintiff Attorney Rosario Gonzalez, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Jo Anne Tyrell, FD). (aum)
Related: [-]
6 6 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Yesenia Cardenas-Lopez, Ashley Mendez-Lopez (no document attached) (aum)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Yesenia Cardenas-Lopez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 4/09/25. (aum)
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Ashley Mendez-Lopez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 4/09/25. (aum)
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER as to Yesenia Cardenas-Lopez: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 4/09/25. (aum)
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER as to Ashley Mendez-Lopez: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 4/09/25. (aum)
Related: [-]