New Mexico District Court
Case #: 5:25-cr-00725
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Terminated:Apr 09, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 1:37 AM MDT
Interested Party
US Probation and Pretrial Services
Represented By
Eduardo Casteneda
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Aaron O Jordan
United States Attorney
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Alberto Trevizo (1)
Terminated: 04/09/2025


Docket last updated: 04/11/2025 2:41 AM MDT
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
Judge update in case as to Alberto Trevizo. District Judge Sarah M Davenport added. (kd)
Related: [-]