Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00832
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 2:29 AM CDT
Defendant
Juan Carlos Michel-Guzman (1)
Represented By
Blas Hernandez Delgado, Jr.
Law Offices Of Blas H. Delgado, Jr.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Daisy Gonzalez
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/11/2025 3:53 AM CDT
Monday, March 10, 2025
Arrest of Juan Carlos Michel-Guzman (drda) [2:25-mj-00695-MHW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
Warrant Returned Executed as to Juan Carlos Michel-Guzman. (drda) [2:25-mj-00695-MHW]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Juan Carlos Michel-Guzman. (drda) [2:25-mj-00695-MHW]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Juan Carlos Michel-Guzman. (drda) [2:25-mj-00695-MHW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to USA as to Juan Carlos Michel-Guzman. (drda) [2:25-mj-00695-MHW]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Juan Carlos Michel-Guzman (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Juan Carlos Michel-Guzman (1).By Judge Matthew H. Watters. (drda) [2:25-mj-00695-MHW]
Related: [-]
3 3 Proceedings held before Judge Matthew H. Watters:Initial Appearance as to Juan Carlos Michel-Guzman held on 3/12/2025 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 3/17/2025 9:00AM before Judge Matthew H. Watters, SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Juan Carlos Michel-Guzman (Court Reporter FTR GOLD - C. LEVRIE.) (drda) [2:25-mj-00695-MHW]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Blas Hernandez Delgado, Jr for Juan Carlos Michel-Guzman appointed. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (ic) [2:25-mj-00695-MHW]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
5 5 MOTION to Continue by Juan Carlos Michel-Guzman. (Delgado, Blas) [2:25-mj-00695-MHW]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER GRANTING5 Motion to Continue as to Juan Carlos Michel-Guzman (1) Detention Hearing and Preliminary Hearing RESET for 3/24/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Matthew H. Watters. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (ic) [2:25-mj-00695-MHW]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
7 7 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Juan Carlos Michel-Guzman (Delgado, Blas) [2:25-mj-00695-MHW]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Juan Carlos Michel-Guzman. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (r013) [2:25-mj-00695-MHW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
9 9 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Juan Carlos Michel-Guzman (1) count(s) 1. (bot1)
Related: [-] dacted Version
11 11 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Juan Carlos Michel-Guzman (bot2)
Related: [-]
12 12 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Juan Carlos Michel-Guzman Arraignment set for 4/24/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Joseph A Cordova, (bot2)
Related: [-]