Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Roberta A Colton
Case #: 8:25-bk-02243
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
First Class Moving Systems, Inc.
5431 E Beaumont Center Blvd Ste 1110
Tampa, FL 33634-5210
Represented By
Scott A. Stichter
Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Postler, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - TPA
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602


Docket last updated: 1 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
57 57 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Wed 04/30 4:47 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Amy Mayer; Casey Lennox; Melissa Sydow; Michael Provenzale; J.R. Boyd; Teresa Dorr WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: (1) Preliminary Hearing on Emergency Motion to Reject Non-Residential Real Property Lease with Crews Commerce Venture, LLC Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor (Doc #39) - GRANTED; AGREED ORDER BY MAYER (2) Preliminary Hearing on Emergency Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens re: Excess Equipment Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor (Doc #43) - GRANTED AS DISCUSSED IN OPEN COURT; ORDER BY MAYER (3) Preliminary Hearing on Emergency Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens re: Storage Vaults Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Interested Party First Class Moving Systems of North Jersey, Inc (Doc #41) - GRANTED AS DISCUSSED IN OPEN COURT; ORDER BY MAYER (4) Preliminary Hearing on Emergency Motion to Reject Non-Residential Real Property Lease with Thor Middlebrook, LLC Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor (Doc #49) - GRANTED, EFFECTIVE DATE DATE MAY 31, 2025, REJECTION DAMAGE CLAIM(S) SHALL BE FILED WITHIN 30 DAYS; ORDER BY MAYER Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
56 56 10 pgs motion Motion to Sell (Including Property Free and Clear of Liens) Wed 04/30 2:12 PM
Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens. Property description: 2015 Kentucky Trailer. (Valley National Bank Collateral) . (Verify Fee)
Related: [-]
55 55 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 04/30 11:26 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Casey Reeder Lennox on behalf of Creditor Valley National Bank. (Lennox, Casey)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Wed 04/30 2:14 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion to Sell([LINK:8:25-bk-02243-RCT] ) [motion,msell2] ( 199.00). Receipt Number A79450322, Amount Paid $ 199.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
54 54 10 pgs motion Motion to Sell (Including Property Free and Clear of Liens) Tue 04/29 12:05 PM
Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens. Property description: Five Trailers. {Highland Capital Corporation Collateral] . (Verify Fee)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Tue 04/29 12:06 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion to Sell([LINK:8:25-bk-02243-RCT] ) [motion,msell2] ( 199.00). Receipt Number A79429169, Amount Paid $ 199.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
53 53 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 04/28 3:26 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice and Service of Papers Filed by Richard W. Riley on behalf of Creditor Simonik Moving & Storage, Inc. (Riley, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
52 52 misc Certificate Of Service (BK) Fri 04/25 3:41 PM
Supplemental Certificate of Service Re: Motion and Notice of Hearing Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor First Class Moving Systems, Inc. Related [+]. (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-] 49 ,51
51 51 notice Notice of Hearing (BK) Fri 04/25 2:39 PM
Notice of Emergency Preliminary Hearing on Emergency Motion to Reject Non-Residential Real Property Lease with Thor Middlebrook, LLC Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor First Class Moving Systems, Inc. Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 4/30/2025 at 02:00 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue . (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-] 49
50 50 misc Certificate of Necessity (BK) Fri 04/25 12:24 PM
Certificate of Necessity of Request for Emergency Hearing Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor First Class Moving Systems, Inc. Related [+]. (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-] 49
49 49 motion Motion to Assume or Reject Lease/Executory Contract Fri 04/25 12:23 PM
Related: [-]
misc Emergency Matters Submission Notification Fri 04/25 12:25 PM
Emergency Matters Submission Notification Re: Emergency Motion to Reject Non-Residential Real Property Lease with Thor Middlebrook, LLC to be heard on or before April 30, 2025 Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor First Class Moving Systems, Inc. Related [+]. (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-] 49
court Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only Fri 04/25 12:54 PM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 04/30/2025 02:00 PM Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Re: Emergency Motion to Reject Non-Residential Real Property Lease with Thor Middlebrook, LLC Doc49 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions : The Court directs Scott A. Stichter to prepare, file, and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Bankruptcy_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 Counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, then counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing immediately upon receipt of this directive. If the notice of hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. Related [+]. (Bill)
Related: [-] 49
Thursday, April 24, 2025
48 48 misc Certificate Of Service (BK) Thu 04/24 12:02 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Email Service Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor First Class Moving Systems, Inc. Related [+]. (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-] 41 ,43 ,47 ,39
47 47 notice Notice of Hearing (BK) Thu 04/24 9:15 AM
Notice of Emergency Hearing on Emergency Motion to Reject Non-Residential Real Property Lease with Crews Commerce Venture, LLC; Emergency Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens. Property; Emergency Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens. Property Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Interested Parties FC Equipment Leasing, Inc., First Class Commercial Services of Orlando, Inc., First Class Moving Systems of North Jersey, Inc., First Class Moving of South Florida, Inc., Debtor First Class Moving Systems, Inc. Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 4/30/2025 at 02:00 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue . (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-] 41 ,43 ,39
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
46 46 misc Certificate Of Service (BK) Wed 04/23 3:17 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Interim Order Granting Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral. Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor First Class Moving Systems, Inc. Related [+]. (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-] 37
45 45 motion Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules, Statements, Ch. 12 or Ch. 13 Plan Wed 04/23 3:16 PM
Related: [-]
44 44 misc Certificate of Necessity (BK) Wed 04/23 2:25 PM
Certificate of Necessity Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor First Class Moving Systems, Inc. Related [+]. (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-] 43
43 43 13 pgs motion Motion to Sell (Including Property Free and Clear of Liens) Wed 04/23 2:24 PM
Emergency Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens. Property description: Excess Equipment. . (Verify Fee)
Related: [-]
42 42 misc Certificate of Necessity (BK) Wed 04/23 2:20 PM
Certificate of Necessity Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Interested Party First Class Moving Systems of North Jersey, Inc. Related [+]. (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-] 41
41 41 13 pgs motion Motion to Sell (Including Property Free and Clear of Liens) Wed 04/23 2:19 PM
Emergency Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens. Property description: Storage Vaults. . (Verify Fee)
Related: [-]
40 40 misc Certificate of Necessity (BK) Wed 04/23 2:16 PM
Certificate of Necessity Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor First Class Moving Systems, Inc. Related [+]. (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-] 39
39 39 motion Motion to Assume or Reject Lease/Executory Contract Wed 04/23 2:15 PM
Related: [-]
misc Emergency Matters Submission Notification Wed 04/23 2:17 PM
Emergency Matters Submission Notification Re: Emergency Motion to Reject Non-Residential Real Property Lease with Crews Commerce Venture, LLC to be heard on or before April 30, 2025 Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor First Class Moving Systems, Inc. Related [+]. (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-] 39
misc Emergency Matters Submission Notification Wed 04/23 2:21 PM
Emergency Matters Submission Notification Re: Emergency Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens. Property description: Storage Vaults to be heard on or before April 30, 2025 Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Interested Party First Class Moving Systems of North Jersey, Inc. Related [+]. (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-] 41
misc Emergency Matters Submission Notification Wed 04/23 2:26 PM
Emergency Matters Submission Notification Re: Emergency Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens. Property description: Excess Equipment to be heard on or before April 30, 2025 Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor First Class Moving Systems, Inc. Related [+]. (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-] 43
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Wed 04/23 2:27 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion to Sell([LINK:8:25-bk-02243-RCT] ) [motion,msell2] ( 199.00). Receipt Number A79363858, Amount Paid $ 199.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Wed 04/23 2:27 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion to Sell([LINK:8:25-bk-02243-RCT] ) [motion,msell2] ( 199.00). Receipt Number A79363858, Amount Paid $ 199.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only Wed 04/23 4:01 PM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 04/30/2025 02:00 PM Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Re: Emergency Motion to Reject Non-Residential Real Property Lease with Crews Commerce Venture, LLC Doc39 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions : The Court directs Scott A. Stichter to prepare, file, and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Bankruptcy_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 Counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, then counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing immediately upon receipt of this directive. If the notice of hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. Related [+]. (Bill)
Related: [-] 39
court Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only Wed 04/23 4:02 PM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 04/30/2025 02:00 PM Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Re: Emergency Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens. Property description: Excess Equipment.. (Verify Fee) Doc43 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions : The Court directs Scott A. Stichter to prepare, file, and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Bankruptcy_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 Counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, then counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing immediately upon receipt of this directive. If the notice of hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. Related [+]. (Bill)
Related: [-] 43
court Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only Wed 04/23 4:08 PM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 04/30/2025 02:00 PM Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Re: Emergency Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens. Property description: Storage Vaults.. (Verify Fee) Doc41 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions : The Court directs Scott A. Stichter to prepare, file, and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Bankruptcy_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 Counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, then counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing immediately upon receipt of this directive. If the notice of hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. Related [+]. (Bill)
Related: [-] 41