New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert E Grossman
Case #: 8:25-bk-71423
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 21, 2025

Debtor
36 Staten Island Corp
51 Eos Rd
Rocky Point, NY 11778-9509
Represented By
36 Staten Island Corp
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Robert Pryor
Pryor & Mandelup LLP 675 Old Country Road
Westbury, NY 11590
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Long Island Federal Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza - Room 560
Central Islip, NY 11722


Docket last updated: 04/11/2025 12:04 PM EDT
Friday, April 11, 2025
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Fri 04/11 11:16 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non Individuals. Fee Amount $ 338 Filed by 36 Staten Island Corp (alh)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Judge - Trustee - 341 Meeting Assignment (Chapter 7 Business No Asset) (Auto Assign) Fri 04/11 11:22 AM
Notice of Chapter 7 Business Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee, Pryor, Robert, with 341(a) Meeting to be held on 5/21/2025 at 10:00 AM at Zoom.us/join - Pryor: Meeting ID 661 772 3896, Passcode 8226103820, Phone 1 (516)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Deficient Filing Chapter 7 Fri 04/11 11:23 AM
Deficient Filing Chapter 7: Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 4/11/2025. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 4/11/2025. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 4/11/2025. Schedule A/B due 4/25/2025. Schedule E/F due 4/25/2025. Schedule G due 4/25/2025. Schedule H due 4/25/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 4/25/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 4/25/2025. (alh)
Related: [-]