Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:23-bk-00999

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joseph N Callaway
Case #: 5:25-ap-00071
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Capital One, N.A.
1680 Capital One Drive
McLean, VA 22102
Represented By
Capital One, N.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
James B Angell, Trustee
PO Box 12347
Raleigh, NC 27605
Represented By
Richard Preston Cook
Richard P. Cook, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance Wed 05/07 3:01 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by James David Horne Jr. on behalf of Capital One, N.A.. (Horne, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 04/15 3:29 PM
Summons Service Executed on Capital One, N.A. 4/15/2025. filed by Richard Preston Cook on behalf of James B Angell, Trustee. (Cook, Richard)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none (ADI) Tue 04/15 3:04 PM
Receipt Of Filing Fee For Complaint([LINK 25-00071 5-JNC] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00), Receipt Number B18475081, Amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 04/10 6:20 PM
Summons Issued on Capital One, N.A. Answer Due 05/12/2025 (Cook, Richard)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/10 6:20 PM
Adversary case 25-00071 5. Complaint by James B Angell, Trustee against Capital One, N.A. (Fee Paid) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Cook, Richard)
Related: [-]