Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:23-bk-00999

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joseph N Callaway
Case #: 5:25-ap-00074
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Samson MCA LLC
17 State St.
New York, NY 10004
Represented By
Samson MCA LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
James B Angell, Trustee
PO Box 12347
Raleigh, NC 27605
Represented By
Richard Preston Cook
Richard P. Cook, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 04/15 3:33 PM
Summons Service Executed on Samson MCA LLC 4/15/2025. filed by Richard Preston Cook on behalf of James B Angell, Trustee. (Cook, Richard)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none (ADI) Tue 04/15 3:04 PM
Receipt Of Filing Fee For Complaint([LINK 25-00074 5-JNC] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00), Receipt Number B18475081, Amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 04/10 6:28 PM
Summons Issued on Samson MCA LLC Answer Due 05/12/2025 (Cook, Richard)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/10 6:28 PM
Adversary case 25-00074 5. Complaint by James B Angell, Trustee against Samson MCA LLC (Fee Paid) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Cook, Richard)
Related: [-]