Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:23-bk-00999

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joseph N Callaway
Case #: 5:25-ap-00075
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Bavarian Imports, LTD., dba BMW of San Antonio
15507 W. IH-10
San Antonio, TX 78249
Represented By
Bavarian Imports, LTD.
contact info
Defendant
Robert Thompson, aka Robb Thompson
18500 92nd Ave
Tinley Park, IL 60487
Represented By
Robert Thompson
contact info
Plaintiff
James B Angell, Trustee
PO Box 12347
Raleigh, NC 27605
Represented By
Richard Preston Cook
Richard P. Cook, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 04/15 3:27 PM
Summons Service Executed on Bavarian Imports, LTD. 4/15/2025. filed by Richard Preston Cook on behalf of James B Angell, Trustee. (Cook, Richard)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none (ADI) Tue 04/15 3:04 PM
Receipt Of Filing Fee For Complaint([LINK 25-00075 5-JNC] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00), Receipt Number B18475081, Amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 04/10 6:35 PM
Summons Issued on Bavarian Imports, LTD. Answer Due 05/12/2025; Robert Thompson Answer Due 05/12/2025 (Cook, Richard)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/10 6:35 PM
Adversary case 25-00075 5. Complaint by James B Angell, Trustee against Bavarian Imports, LTD., Robert Thompson (Fee Paid) (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Cook, Richard)
Related: [-]