Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:23-bk-00998

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joseph N Callaway
Case #: 5:25-ap-00076
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Matthew Sears, a/k/a Matt Sears
9127 County Line Road
Kernersville, NC 27284
Represented By
Matthew Sears
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
Davis Hartman Wright, PLLC 209 Pollock Street
New Bern, NC 28560
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Buckmiller & Frost, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
3 3 court Summons Reissued Mon 04/21 11:36 AM
Summons Reissued on Matthew Sears Date Issued 4/21/2025, Answer Due 5/21/2025 (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 04/10 10:07 PM
Summons Issued on Matthew Sears Answer Due 05/12/2025 (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/10 10:07 PM
Adversary case 25-00076 5. Complaint by John C. Bircher III, Trustee against Matthew Sears (Fee Deferred) (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - List of Transfers to Matthew Sears