Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:23-bk-00998

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joseph N Callaway
Case #: 5:25-ap-00077
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Christopher M. Barry
7305 Goldenview Court
Apex, NC 27539
Represented By
Christopher M. Barry
contact info
Defendant
Melissa L. Barry
7305 Goldenview Court
Apex, NC 27539
Represented By
Melissa L. Barry
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
Davis Hartman Wright, PLLC 209 Pollock Street
New Bern, NC 28560
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Buckmiller & Frost, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
6 6 order Consent Order (No Motion) Fri 05/02 10:56 AM
Stipulation and Order Extending Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Answer due 6/12/2025. (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
5 5 misc Affidavit Mon 04/21 10:19 AM
Affidavit of Service filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued (auto),3 Summons Reissued
Friday, April 18, 2025
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance Fri 04/18 5:23 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by W. Sidney Aldridge on behalf of Christopher M. Barry, Melissa L. Barry. (Aldridge, W.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
3 3 court Summons Reissued Fri 04/11 1:40 PM
Summons Reissued on Christopher M. Barry Date Issued 4/11/2025, Answer Due 5/12/2025; Melissa L. Barry Date Issued 4/11/2025, Answer Due 5/12/2025 (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 04/10 10:13 PM
Summons Issued on Chris Barry Answer Due 05/12/2025; Melissa Barry Answer Due 05/12/2025 (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/10 10:13 PM
Adversary case 25-00077 5. Complaint by John C. Bircher III, Trustee against Chris Barry, Melissa Barry (Fee Deferred) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]